This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:43:10 (UTC).

Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Domenico and Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

Referral Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty

415 Hyman Avenue

Aspen, CO 81611

Craig S. Morris

Aspen, CO 81611

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tracy L. Ashmore

Attorney at Robinson Waters & O'Dorisio PC

1099 18Th Street, Granite Tower

Denver, CO 80202-1937

Defendant Attorneys

David Edward Kay

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202-2626

Larry D. Fields

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP-Kansas City

2300 Main Street, Two Pershing Square

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty, Craig S. Morris. (Ashmore, Tracy) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/4/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00125-DDD. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty, Craig S. Morris All parties do not consent.. (Ashmore, Tracy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kay, David) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kay, David) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT for Return of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Exhibit A, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Zurich American Insurance Company on 12/17/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#4

(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kay, David) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit B - State Court Register of Actions

1 #8

Exhibit A-8 - State Court Order re Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsi

1 #7

Exhibit A-7 - State Court Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadi

1 #6

Exhibit A-6 - State Court Entry of Appearance

1 #5

Exhibit A-5 - State Court Delay Reduction Order

1 #4

Exhibit A-4 - State Court Summons

1 #3

Exhibit A-3 - State Court Return of Service

1 #2

Exhibit A-2 - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-1 - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2022 11:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. At the time of the hearing, the number to call the courtroom is 888-363-4749, Access 3136546#. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on March 18, 2022. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, ) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Pitkin County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 22-cv-00125-DDD-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/16/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/15/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty, Craig S. Morris. (Ashmore, Tracy) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/4/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00125-DDD. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00125-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty, Craig S. Morris All parties do not consent.. (Ashmore, Tracy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kay, David) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kay, David) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#11) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3-17-2022 at 10:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, 7 days before the Telephonic Scheduling Conference (on or before 3-10-2022). The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#7] is due 3-10-2022. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1-27-2022. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The Court finds good cause to GRANT the stipulated motion. Accordingly, Defendant has until 2-8-2022 to answer or otherwise respond. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1-27-2022. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kay, David) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tracy L. Ashmore on behalf of Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty, Craig S. MorrisAttorney Tracy L. Ashmore added to party Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty(pty:pla), Attorney Tracy L. Ashmore added to party Craig S. Morris(pty:pla) (Ashmore, Tracy) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER - Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, granted on January 14, 2022 By Pitkin County Court Judge Johnathan Bruce Pototsky.. (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT for Return of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Exhibit A, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Zurich American Insurance Company on 12/17/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Zurich American Insurance Company, filed by Craig S. Morris, Aspen Snowmass Sotheby's International Realty.(norlin, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company from Pitkin County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30127. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8271909), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-2 - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-3 - State Court Return of Service, #4 Exhibit A-4 - State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit A-5 - State Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit A-6 - State Court Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit A-7 - State Court Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading and Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit A-8 - State Court Order re Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading, #9 Exhibit B - State Court Register of Actions, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kay, David) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry David Fields