This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:24:49 (UTC).

ASKARZADEH v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 ASKARZADEH filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dabney L. Friedrich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03641

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dabney L. Friedrich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARANEH ASKARZADEH

Defendants

MIKE POMPEO

CARL RISCH

KEVIN MCALEENAN

WILLIAM BARR

JOHN DOES #1-#10

AMBER BASKETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer E. Nimer

Attorney at NIMER LAW LLC

3803 Attucks Drive, Suite A

Powell, OH 43065

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AMBER BASKETTE served on 12/16/2019; MIKE POMPEO served on 12/16/2019; CARL RISCH served on 12/16/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN MCALEENAN served on 12/16/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/16/2019. (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/8/2020. (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, AMBER BASKETTE, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH, and U.S. Attorney. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6624244) filed by TARANEH ASKARZADEH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons AUSA, #9 Summons USAG, #10 Summons Acting Sec of DHS, #11 Summons Secretary of State, #12 Summons Assistant Secretary of Cons Affairs, #13 Summons CG Embassy Ankara)(Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less