This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/28/2020 at 12:07:10 (UTC).

Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago et al v. White et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against White. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary M. Rowland and Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01478

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mary M. Rowland

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Common Cause Illinois

CHANGE Illinois

Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund

Chicago Votes Education Fund

Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights

Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago

Defendants

Illinois State of Board of Elections

Jesse White

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles F. Smith, Jr.

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP CH

155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606-1720

Ami D. Gandhi

Attorney at Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law,

100 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60602

Corbin Houston

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp

155 N Upper Wacker Dr.

Chicago, IL 60606

Aneel Lachman Chablani

Attorney at Chicago Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights

100 N. Lasalle St., Ste. 600

Chicago, IL 60602

Niyati Shah

Attorney at Asian Americans Advancing Justice - AAJC

1620 L Street, Nw, Suite 1050

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Michael T. Dierkes

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General's Office (100 West Randolph)

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Illinois State of Board of Elections, Jesse White by Michael T. Dierkes (Dierkes, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16806659. (Shah, Niyati) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund, Common Cause Illinois, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, Chicago Votes Education Fund, CHANGE Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights as to Illinois State of Board of Elections on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Houston, Corbin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund, Common Cause Illinois, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, Chicago Votes Education Fund, CHANGE Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights as to Jesse White on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Houston, Corbin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr for all further proceedings. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/2/2020.(pk, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rc, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Illinois State of Board of Elections, Jesse White (dxb, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, CHANGE Illinois, Chicago Votes Education Fund, Common Cause Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund by Ami D. Gandhi (Gandhi, Ami) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, CHANGE Illinois, Chicago Votes Education Fund, Common Cause Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund by Aneel Lachman Chablani (Chablani, Aneel) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, CHANGE Illinois, Chicago Votes Education Fund, Common Cause Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund by Corbin Houston (Houston, Corbin) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Smith, Charles) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, CHANGE Illinois, Chicago Votes Education Fund, Common Cause Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund by Charles F. Smith, Jr (Smith, Charles) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Charles) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Illinois Public Interest Research Group Education Fund, Common Cause Illinois, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, Chicago Votes Education Fund, CHANGE Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16777430. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Smith, Charles) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Chicago is a litigant

Latest cases where ILLINOIS COALITION FOR IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE RIGHTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T. Dierkes