This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2019 at 07:05:46 (UTC).

Ashley v. Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Ashley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David L. Russell and Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00432

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David L. Russell

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob Ashley

Defendant

Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M David Riggs

Attorney at Riggs Abney Neal Turpen Orbison Lewis-TULSA

502 W Sixth St

Tulsa, OK 74119-1010

Rex W Thompson

Attorney at Riggs Abney Neal Turpen Orbison Lewis-TULSA

502 W 6Th St

Tulsa, OK 74119-1010

Richard A Gann

Attorney at Riggs Abney Neal Turpen Orbison Lewis-TULSA

502 W Sixth St

Tulsa, OK 74119-1010

Defendant Attorneys

Jay P Walters

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jeffrey S Davis

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell-HOUSTON

1000 Louisiana St, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002-5011

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Exhibit 2: Pointon Aff & Arbitration Agreement

#15

(#15) MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration by Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Patterson-Newfield Drilling Contract, #2 Exhibit 2: Pointon Aff & Arbitration Agreement)(Walters, Jay) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#14

(#14) ENTER ORDER re #9 Status/Scheduling Docket; The Status/Scheduling Conference scheduled for August 6, 2019, at 9:45 a.m. before Judge Russell is STRICKEN, to be reset by Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/2/19. (jw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/28/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable David L. Russell recused.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/28/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Jay P Walters on behalf of Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc (Walters, Jay) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER; Accordingly, Mr. Davis is granted until June 28, 2019, to show association with local counsel as required by LCvR83.3(a), as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/13/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#9

(#9) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 09:45 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 7/29/2019. (jw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey S Davis on behalf of Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc (Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A Gann on behalf of Jacob Ashley (Gann, Richard) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by M David Riggs on behalf of Jacob Ashley (Riggs, M) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Ashley. Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc served on 5/15/2019. (Riggs, M) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc. (nv) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc filed by Jacob Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration by Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Patterson-Newfield Drilling Contract, #2 Exhibit 2: Pointon Aff & Arbitration Agreement)(Walters, Jay) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ENTER ORDER re #9 Status/Scheduling Docket; The Status/Scheduling Conference scheduled for August 6, 2019, at 9:45 a.m. before Judge Russell is STRICKEN, to be reset by Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/2/19. (jw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/28/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable David L. Russell recused.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/28/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Jay P Walters on behalf of Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc (Walters, Jay) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER; Accordingly, Mr. Davis is granted until June 28, 2019, to show association with local counsel as required by LCvR83.3(a), as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/13/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 09:45 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 7/29/2019. (jw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey S Davis on behalf of Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc (Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Rex W Thompson on behalf of Jacob Ashley (Thompson, Rex) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A Gann on behalf of Jacob Ashley (Gann, Richard) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by M David Riggs on behalf of Jacob Ashley (Riggs, M) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Ashley. Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc served on 5/15/2019. (Riggs, M) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2920283. (Riggs, M) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc. (nv) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc filed by Jacob Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey S Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay P Walters