This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:16:37 (UTC).

Ashley et al v. O'Daniel et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Ashley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against O'Daniel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00686

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Catherine Rachel Jones

Katelyn Delores Ashley

Holly Ashley

Madisonville, TX 77864

Delores Ashley

Michiel Alford Ashley, III

Marquel Sierra Ashley

Defendants

Robert O'Daniel

Amanda O'Daniel

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Thomas M. Spitaletto

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4800

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Letter

#6

(#6) MOTION for Nonsuit Without Prejudice by Holly Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Rule 16(b) initial pretrial conference on Wednesday, February 12, 2020 at 2:15 p.m. by telephone before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Hammit sent via USPS. (bw) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE (Certificate of Notice of Removal) by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Spitaletto, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Spitaletto, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12922335), filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spitaletto, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Nonsuit Without Prejudice by Holly Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Rule 16(b) initial pretrial conference on Wednesday, February 12, 2020 at 2:15 p.m. by telephone before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Hammit sent via USPS. (bw) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE (Certificate of Notice of Removal) by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Spitaletto, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Spitaletto, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12922335), filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spitaletto, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.