This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2020 at 08:30:17 (UTC).

Asher v. C & C of Sevier, Inc. (PLR2)

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Asher filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against C C of Sevier, Inc PLR2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rhonda Asher

Defendant

C & C of Sevier, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Ira Zwilling

Attorney at Law Office of Edward I. Zwilling, LLC

4000 Eagle Point Corporate Drive

Birmingham, AL 35242

Defendant Attorneys

Edward Howard Trent

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones PLLC (Knoxville)

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900

Knoxville, TN 37902

L Eric Ebbert

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones PLLC (Knoxville)

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Other Civil Coversheet

1 #2

Summons Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Other Consent Form

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by L Eric Ebbert on behalf of C & C of Sevier, Inc (Ebbert, L) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/21/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 02/21/20. (JBR) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Consent Form) (KMK) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by C & C of Sevier, Inc. (Trent, Edward) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by C & C of Sevier, Inc.(Trent, Edward) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda Asher. C & C of Sevier, Inc served on 1/28/2020. (Zwilling, Edward) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/9/2020. (BDG) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/9/2020. (BDG) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/9/2020. (BDG) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to C & C of Sevier, Inc. (BDG) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BDG) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against C & C OF SEVIER, INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4188009.), filed by RHONDA ASHER. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Zwilling, Edward) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward I Zwilling