This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2022 at 07:43:37 (UTC).

Ashenfelter v. Gosh et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Ashenfelter filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Gosh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-04059

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Austin Ashenfelter

Galesburg, IL 61401

Defendants

Partha Gosh

Chase Wilhelm

Mark Williams

. Duffield

John Doe

IDOC

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Austin Ashenfelter.(SAG) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Austin Ashenfelter.(SAG) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $36.81. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 4/25/2022. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/25/2022. (SAG) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Austin Ashenfelter (SAG) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Austin Ashenfelter.(SAG) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Austin Ashenfelter.(SAG) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IDOC is a litigant