This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2020 at 08:29:31 (UTC).

Ashby et al v. Aubuchon

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Ashby filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Aubuchon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan B Johnson and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan B Johnson

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melanie D Horton

Donald D Ashby

Donald D Ashby (WDR)

Melanie D Horton (WDR)

Defendant

Karen A Aubuchon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley L Booke

Attorney at ROBERT P SCHUSTER PC

250 Veronica Lane, Suite 204, Po Box 13160

Jackson, WY 83002

Robert P Schuster

Attorney at ROBERT P SCHUSTER PC

230 Veronica Lane, Suite 204, Po Box 13160

Jackson, WY 83002

Defendant Attorney

Peter H Christensen

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 South 200 East, Suite 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #3

Magistrate Consent

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER Granting Extension by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. Upon consent of the parties, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5) shall be extended to 4/17/2020. (Rankin, Kelly) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Misconduct and Punitive/Exemplary Damages filed by Defendant Karen A Aubuchon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages)(Christensen, Peter) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant Karen A Aubuchon. (Christensen, Peter) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Karen A Aubuchon. (Christensen, Peter) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Karen A Aubuchon (Christensen, Peter) Modified text on 2/27/2020 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (one summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY032484), filed by Melanie D Horton, Melanie D Horton (WDR), Donald D Ashby (WDR), Donald D Ashby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #3 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H Christensen