This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 11:57:07 (UTC).

ASH v. ROTHENBERG et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 ASH filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ROTHENBERG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02534

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASSIUS ASH

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Defendants

MARC ROTHENBERG

CARLISLE

VICKY NEIMAN

PHILIP MASON RILEY

EMILY WHITE

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Envelope

17 #1

Exhibit

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) CLOSED JUDGMENT/FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/17/2021.(AKH) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#15

(#15) ENTRY DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - In the Entry of October 6, 2021, the Court notified Plaintiff of the deficiency in his motion to proceed in forma pauperis provided notice that the action would be dismissed if Plaintiff did not pay the filing fee or submit a copy of the transaction history associated with his institution trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action by October 29, 2021 (Dkt. #5 ).The Court explained that it could not rule on the motion to proceed in forma pauperis without first receiving the trust account transaction history. (Dkt. #9 at 1.) The Plaintiff attaches what appears to be the last page of a chronological case summary from a state court case, indicating that he owes $100.00 to the state court. The information provided by Plaintiff is not helpful and is unresponsive to the Court's order. Plaintiff has not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with his institution trust account, and he has not paid the filing fee. Therefore, consistent with the Court's prior Notice, the Court must dismiss this action, without prejudice. Final judgment consistent with this Entry will be issued under separate order. (See Entry). Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/17/2021. (AKH) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

14 #1

Envelope

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Envelope

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Envelope

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Envelope

11 #11

Main Document

9 #1

Envelope

9 #9

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER ACTION - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff Cassius Ash's "Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee" (Dkt. #2 ). The motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled upon because Mr. Ash has not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with his institution trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action on September 27, 2021. Mr. Ash shall pay the $402.00 filing fee to the Clerk of the District Court or, submit the necessary transaction history by OCTOBER 29, 2021. Failure to respond or file the appropriate document by this deadline may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Copy sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/6/2021 (AKH) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Letter from Cassuis Ash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (JDC) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CLOSED JUDGMENT/FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/17/2021.(AKH) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENTRY DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - In the Entry of October 6, 2021, the Court notified Plaintiff of the deficiency in his motion to proceed in forma pauperis provided notice that the action would be dismissed if Plaintiff did not pay the filing fee or submit a copy of the transaction history associated with his institution trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action by October 29, 2021 (Dkt. #5 ).The Court explained that it could not rule on the motion to proceed in forma pauperis without first receiving the trust account transaction history. (Dkt. #9 at 1.) The Plaintiff attaches what appears to be the last page of a chronological case summary from a state court case, indicating that he owes $100.00 to the state court. The information provided by Plaintiff is not helpful and is unresponsive to the Court's order. Plaintiff has not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with his institution trust account, and he has not paid the filing fee. Therefore, consistent with the Court's prior Notice, the Court must dismiss this action, without prejudice. Final judgment consistent with this Entry will be issued under separate order. (See Entry). Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/17/2021. (AKH) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Clarification of Claims 4, filed by Plaintiff CASSIUS ASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clarification of Claims 3, filed by Plaintiff CASSIUS ASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clarification of Claims 2, filed by Plaintiff CASSIUS ASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clarification of Claims 1, filed by Plaintiff CASSIUS ASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - On October 6, 2021, the Court provided notice to pro se Plaintiff regarding confidential information contained in a document and granting leave to file redactions. A redacted version of the previously filed document has not been filed. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall remove the security restrictions on Dkt. #2 . Copy sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/8/2021.(AKH) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE re #5 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff CASSIUS ASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter regarding False Charges, from Cassius Ash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (AKH) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter filed by Cassius Ash. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDC) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Cassius Ash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (JDC) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER ACTION - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff Cassius Ash's "Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee" (Dkt. #2 ). The motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled upon because Mr. Ash has not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with his institution trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action on September 27, 2021. Mr. Ash shall pay the $402.00 filing fee to the Clerk of the District Court or, submit the necessary transaction history by OCTOBER 29, 2021. Failure to respond or file the appropriate document by this deadline may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Copy sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/6/2021 (AKH) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter regarding Vicky Neiman from Cassius Ash. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AKH) Modified on 10/1/2021 (AKH). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, CASSIUS ASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CARLISLE, VICKY NEIMAN, PHILIP MASON RILEY, MARC ROTHENBERG, EMILY WHITE, filed by CASSIUS ASH. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARLISLE CORPORATION is a litigant