This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:22:20 (UTC).

ASH PAINT & BODY INC v. OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 ASH PAINT BODY INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ash Paint & Body, Inc. d/b/a Georgia Truck Service

ASH PAINT & BODY INC doing business as GEORGIA TRUCK SERVICE

Defendants

OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Axis Surplus Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JEFFERY REMINGTON HUGGINS

110 Norcross St

Roswell, GA 30075

MICHAEL DAVIS TURNER

110 Norcross St

Roswell, GA 30075

Defendant Attorneys

MARK T DIETRICHS

1355 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 300, The Peachtree

Atlanta, GA 30309-3238

ALEXANDER A MIKHALEVSKY

1355 Peachtree St Ne Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

WAYNE D TAYLOR

1050 Crown Pointe Pkwy, Ste 1500

Atlanta, GA 30338

MICHELLE ALAMEDA SHERMAN

1050 Crown Pointe Pkwy, Ste 1500

Atlanta, GA 30338

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 3/19/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/19/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bcl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#9

(#9) Jurisdictional Statement by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(TAYLOR, WAYNE)Attorney WAYNE D TAYLOR added to party AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Correspondence re: Service of Process Upon Defendant AXIS Surplus Insurance Company by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

5 #1

Required Form

#5

(#5) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE GROUP, Corporate Parent OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate PROPERTY-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS LIFE INSURANCE, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE GROUP, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Certificate of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit A - Underpleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3543626, $400 filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Underpleadings, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Removal)(DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 3/19/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/19/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bcl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Jurisdictional Statement by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(TAYLOR, WAYNE)Attorney WAYNE D TAYLOR added to party AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Correspondence re: Service of Process Upon Defendant AXIS Surplus Insurance Company by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE GROUP, Corporate Parent OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate PROPERTY-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS LIFE INSURANCE, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE GROUP, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(bcl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(bcl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3543626, $400 filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Underpleadings, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Removal)(DIETRICHS, MARK) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less