This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:41:41 (UTC).

Asghedom v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Asghedom filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06311

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samiel Asghedom

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr.Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Marcella Deshonda Slay

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 South Wacker Dr. Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of the TRO (Dckt. No. #23 ) is hereby granted. The Court extends the TRO until January 31, 2022. Plaintiff must file a summary of frozen funds by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#24

(#24) SURETY BOND in the amount of $140,000.00 posted by Samiel Asghedom (Document not scanned). (bg, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

23 #1

Declaration of Isaku M. Begert

#23

(#23) MOTION by Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom by Marcella Deshonda Slay (Slay, Marcella) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #11 ) is hereby granted. Temporary Restraining Order to follow. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #16 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff must file a summary of frozen funds by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#16

(#17) MEMORANDUM by Samiel Asghedom in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #16 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#11

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #11 ) is hereby granted. Temporary Restraining Order to follow. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #16 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff must file a summary of frozen funds by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#3

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #11 ) is hereby granted. Temporary Restraining Order to follow. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #16 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff must file a summary of frozen funds by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (ak, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of the TRO (Dckt. No. #23 ) is hereby granted. The Court extends the TRO until January 31, 2022. Plaintiff must file a summary of frozen funds by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SURETY BOND in the amount of $140,000.00 posted by Samiel Asghedom (Document not scanned). (bg, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION by Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom by Marcella Deshonda Slay (Slay, Marcella) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 1/3/2022. Mailed notice(jjr, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #11 ) is hereby granted. Temporary Restraining Order to follow. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #16 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff must file a summary of frozen funds by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Samiel Asghedom (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM by Samiel Asghedom in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #16 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jj, ) Modified on 11/24/2021 (jj, ). Duplicate Clerk's Notice of Local Rule 73.1(b) entered in error. (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Samiel Asghedom Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Samiel Asghedom; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18907293. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaku Begert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin R. Gaudio