This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:12:25 (UTC).

Asemani v. State of Maryland

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Asemani filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Maryland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard D. Bennett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02449

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard D. Bennett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Billy G. Asemani

Westover, MD 21890

Respondent

State of Maryland

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Appendix A

#2

(#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/5/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m of Order & Forms 9.5.19) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy G. Asemani. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/5/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m of Order & Forms 9.5.19) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy G. Asemani. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.