This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:24:24 (UTC).

Asciutto et al v. Oxford Community School District et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Asciutto filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Oxford Community School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10407

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicholette Asciutto

John Vackaro

JA

AA

MV

Defendants

Oxford Community School District

Steven Wolf

Timothy Throne

Nicholas Ejak

Pam Fine

Shawn Hopkins

Teacher #1

Teacher #2

Teacher #3

Interested Parties

Michael L. Pitt

Beth M. Rivers

Megan A Bonanni

Kevin M Carlson

Deborah Gordon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert M. Giroux

Andrew John Laurila

Defendant Attorneys

Annabel F. Shea

John L. Miller

Kenneth B. Chapie

Timothy J. Mullins

Interested Party Attorneys

Michael L. Pitt

Beth M. Rivers

Megan Bonanni

Kevin M. Carlson

Deborah L. Gordon

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8808334 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC Eastern District, 2:21-cv-12871, Judge Mark A. Goldsmith] (Giroux, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Nicholas Ejak, Pam Fine, Shawn Hopkins, Oxford Community School District, Teacher #1, Teacher #2, Teacher #3, Timothy Throne, Steven Wolf* (DAll) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (SSch) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Pitt on behalf of Michael L. Pitt. (Pitt, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Beth M. Rivers on behalf of Beth M. Rivers. (Rivers, Beth) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Bonanni on behalf of Megan A Bonanni. (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Carlson on behalf of Kevin M Carlson. (Carlson, Kevin) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Laurila on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah L. Gordon on behalf of Deborah Gordon. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah L. Gordon on behalf of Deborah Gordon. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Robert M. Giroux re #9 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Laurila on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [STRICKEN]CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Giroux, Robert) Modified on 4/13/2022 (DAll). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Carlson on behalf of Kevin M Carlson. (Carlson, Kevin) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Bonanni on behalf of Megan A Bonanni. (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Beth M. Rivers on behalf of Beth M. Rivers. (Rivers, Beth) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Pitt on behalf of Michael L. Pitt. (Pitt, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (SSch) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Nicholas Ejak, Pam Fine, Shawn Hopkins, Oxford Community School District, Teacher #1, Teacher #2, Teacher #3, Timothy Throne, Steven Wolf* (DAll) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8808334 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC Eastern District, 2:21-cv-12871, Judge Mark A. Goldsmith] (Giroux, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less