This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 08:36:42 (UTC).

Ascension Arizona v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Ascension Arizona filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce G Macdonald and James A Soto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00434

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce G Macdonald

Presiding Judge

James A Soto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ascension Arizona doing business as Carondelet St. Joseph's Hospital

Defendants

Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated a corporation doing business as Sedgwick Managed Care

Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated

Amerisure Insurance Company

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mikaela G Cox

Attorney at Helton Law Group APC

1590 Corporate Dr.

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Whitney M Harvey

Attorney at Helton Law Group APC

1590 Corporate Dr.

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Nathanael J Scheer

Attorney at Wong Carter PC

3003 N Central Ave., Ste. 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Stewart Franklin Gross

Attorney at Law Offices of Stewart F Gross PLLC

3401 N 32Nd St.

Phoenix, AZ 85018-5606

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) *First MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Time to Answer by Amerisure Insurance Company, Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated. (Gross, Stewart) *Modified to correct motion type on 11/29/2021 (MYE). (Entered: 11/26/2021)

#19

(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ascension Arizona.(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#17

(#17) *Amended PDF filed at Doc. #19 - AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ascension Arizona.(Harvey, Whitney) *Modified on 11/17/2021 (MYE). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Ascension Arizona . (Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald for Report and Recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-21-434- TUC-JAS (BGM). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 11/9/21. (JAM) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated. (Gross, Stewart) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated. (Gross, Stewart) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER pursuant to #7 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file their First Amended Complaint and required notice on or before Monday, November 15, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' responsive pleading shall be due according to the statutory time for response following the filing of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 11/5/2021. (SCA) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#8) ORDER pursuant to #7 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file their First Amended Complaint and required notice on or before Monday, November 15, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' responsive pleading shall be due according to the statutory time for response following the filing of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 11/5/2021. (SCA) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ascension Arizona identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for Ascension Arizona. (Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#5

(#5) *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Whitney Harvey. (Harvey, Whitney) *Modified to correct event type on 11/1/2021 (MYE). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Ascension Arizona, Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated. (ARC) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Amerisure Insurance Company. (ARC) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20001326. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-434-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (ARC) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) *First MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Time to Answer by Amerisure Insurance Company, Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated. (Gross, Stewart) *Modified to correct motion type on 11/29/2021 (MYE). (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ascension Arizona.(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #17 Amended Complaint filed by Ascension Arizona. Incorrect PDF attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) *Amended PDF filed at Doc. #19 - AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ascension Arizona.(Harvey, Whitney) *Modified on 11/17/2021 (MYE). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Ascension Arizona . (Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald for Report and Recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-21-434- TUC-JAS (BGM). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 11/9/21. (JAM) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge James A Soto. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-434-TUC-JAS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#13) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated. (Gross, Stewart) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated. (Gross, Stewart) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisure Insurance Company. (Gross, Stewart) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER pursuant to #7 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file their First Amended Complaint and required notice on or before Monday, November 15, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' responsive pleading shall be due according to the statutory time for response following the filing of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 11/5/2021. (SCA) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND THE DUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSIVE PLEADING (First Request) by Ascension Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ascension Arizona identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for Ascension Arizona. (Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Whitney Harvey. (Harvey, Whitney) *Modified to correct event type on 11/1/2021 (MYE). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Ascension Arizona, Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated. (ARC) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Amerisure Insurance Company. (ARC) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20001326. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-434-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (ARC) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule 102a FASTAR Certificate upon Amerisure Insurance Company on 9/24/2021. Upon Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated on 9/22/2021. Upon Careworks Managed Care Services Incorporated on 9/22/2021. (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20214314. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20001326 filed by Amerisure Insurance Company. (Gross, Stewart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amerisure Insurance Company (The) is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant