This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2021 at 07:50:58 (UTC).

Ascarie et al v. QBE Insurance Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Ascarie filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against QBE Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03062

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mahmoud Ascarie

San Jose, CA 95128

Shayon Ascarie

San Jose, CA 95128

Defendants

QBE Insurance Corporation

QBE Americas, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Roger Scott Raphael

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Rebecca R. Weinreich

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice to Adverse Party

1 #3

Declaration of Roger S. Raphael

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by QBE Americas, Inc... (Raphael, Roger) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mahmoud Ascarie.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by QBE Americas, Inc.. (Raphael, Roger) (Filed on 5/11/2021) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by QBE Americas, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation re: Standing Order, Scheduling Order, et al. (Raphael, Roger) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by QBE AMERICAS, INC., QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Raphael, Roger) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 21CV375729. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15893202). Filed byQBE AMERICAS, INC., QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Declaration of Roger S. Raphael)(Raphael, Roger) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QBE Americas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger S Raphael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R Weinreich