This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2021 at 07:09:00 (UTC).

Asbestos Workers Local Union No. 2 Welfare Fund v. Allergan, PLC

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Asbestos Workers Local Union No 2 Welfare Fund filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan, PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45023

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Walgreen Co

Rite Aid Corporation

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Actavis South Atlantic LLC

Endo International PLC

INDIVIDOR, INC. F/K/A RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC

Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.

PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC

Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals

IPAX LABORATORIES, LLC F/K/A IMPAX GENERICS D/B/A GLOBAL PHARMACEUTICALS

Walgreen Eastern Co.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Miami-Luken Inc

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Carolyn Kendall

Attorney at Post & Schell

4 Penn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Albert G. Bixler

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott

Two Liberty Place, 22Nd Floor, 50 South 16Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Other Attorneys

Gregory S. Spizer

Attorney at Anapol Weiss - Philadelphia

One Logan Square, 130 North 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Mark D. Villanueva

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS LISTED ON SCHEDULE A ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, AND WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAN A. POSER FOR INCLUSION IN THE COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS; ETC. (JL ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER THAT REQUEST (DOC. 10) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/18/20. 12/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#10

(#10) REQUEST to file a Reply to the Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 9), filed by ASBESTOS WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 2 WELFARE FUND. (SPIZER, GREGORY) Modified on 12/17/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CVS HEALTH CORPORATION AND WALGREEN, CO TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND IS EXTENDED TO 12/11/2020. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/24/2020. 11/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN KENDALL on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(KENDALL, CAROLYN) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-05191. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal record transferred to the Northern District of Ohio via interdistrict transfer system. (md, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS LISTED ON SCHEDULE A ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, AND WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAN A. POSER FOR INCLUSION IN THE COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS; ETC. (JL ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by ASBESTOS WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 2 WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(SPIZER, GREGORY)[Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPAPER #11 MAILED TO UNREPS (JL ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ASBESTOS WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 2 WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SPIZER, GREGORY) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER THAT REQUEST (DOC. 10) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/18/20. 12/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST to file a Reply to the Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 9), filed by ASBESTOS WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 2 WELFARE FUND. (SPIZER, GREGORY) Modified on 12/17/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopies of #7 Stip and Order mailed to Unreps. (mas, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CVS HEALTH CORPORATION AND WALGREEN, CO TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND IS EXTENDED TO 12/11/2020. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/24/2020. 11/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ASBESTOS WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 2 WELFARE FUND.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(SPIZER, GREGORY) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN KENDALL on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(KENDALL, CAROLYN) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14647142), filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (order), #2 Exhibit 2 (court pleadings), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Par Sterile Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Miami-Luken, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC is a litigant