This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2019 at 07:21:19 (UTC).

ASANTE ROUGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 ASANTE ROUGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02774

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHS-Stanly

Baylor Medical Center Irving

NEW MILFORD HOSPITAL

BAYLOR HEART AND VASCULAR HOSPITAL

BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE

CMC - Northeast

HEART HOSPITAL BAYLOR DENTON

NOVANT HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER

CMS-Blue Ridge a/k/a Grace Hospital

DANBURY HOSPITAL

NORWALK HOSPITAL

BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE

ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER

AVERA QUEEN OF PEACE HOSPITAL

CHS-Anson

MULTICARE AUBURN MEDICAL CENTER

ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

SCOTLAND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Bon Secours Saint Francis Hospital

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR, II

57 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Jay Sedley

Attorney at SEDLEY HEALTH LAW GROUP

18880 Douglas, Suite 404

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Summons 01

1 #2

Summons 02

1 #3

Summons 03

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit A

1 #6

Exhibit B

#2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

3 #1

Notice and Consent

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sedley, Alan) Modified event on 9/19/2019 (zeg). Modified docket text on 9/24/2019 (zeg). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6380625) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Summons 01, #2 Summons 02, #3 Summons 03, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B)(Sedley, Alan) Modified filer on 9/24/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scotland Memorial Hospital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE is a litigant