This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2020 at 13:34:26 (UTC).

ASANTE et al v. AZAR et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 ASANTE filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00601

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASANTE

YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER

ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC.

RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER

RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

ALEX M. AZAR, II

SEEMA VERMA

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dean L. Johnson

181 Utsalady Road

Camano Island, WA 98282

Thomas J. Weiss

Attorney at WEISS & ZAMAN

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2140

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Derek S. Hammond

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#13

2 #7

Exhibit E

2 #2

Affidavit Dean L. Johnson

2 #1

Memorandum in Support

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Verma

1 #3

Summons CMS

1 #2

Summons HHS

1 #1

Summons Azar

#1

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER denying #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/21/2020. (lcsd) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/21/2020. (lcsd) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASANTE, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER re #1 Complaint,, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief Department of Health and Human Services. (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Based on review of the parties' briefing and the parties' representation in the joint status report #13 that they do not need an evidentiary hearing, the court has determined it will take the pending motion for preliminary injunction #2 under advisement without a hearing. SO ORDERED by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 04/06/2020. (tb) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASANTE, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER re #1 Complaint,, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief Pursuant to FRCP 4(i). (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/3/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2020. (Johnson, Dean) Modified dates on 3/23/2020 (ztd). Modified on 3/24/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/3/2020. (Johnson, Dean) Modified on 3/23/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SEEMA VERMA served on 3/3/2020 (Johnson, Dean) Modified date on 3/23/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 3/3/2020 (Johnson, Dean) Modified date on 3/23/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/3/2020 (Johnson, Dean) Modified date on 3/23/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. By March 5, 2020, the parties shall meet and confer and then file a Joint Report that addresses the following issues: 1) a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #2 ; 2) a statement concerning whether the parties anticipate factual disputes between the affiants; 3) a statement concerning whether the parties believe an evidentiary hearing, see LCvR 65.1(d), will be necessary to resolve Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, and, if so, how the parties propose proceeding at such a hearing; and 4) a statement from the government whether it is willing to voluntarily cease dispersing funds until the court decides Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The parties may also address any other issues they believe will be helpful to the court. Any disagreements should be noted in the Joint Report. If the parties cannot agree to a briefing schedule, the government's opposition will be due by March 9, 2020, see LCvR 65.1(c) ("The opposition shall be served and filed within seven days after service of the application for preliminary injunction, and shall be accompanied by all affidavits on which the defendant intends to rely."), and Plaintiffs' reply will be due by March 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/2/2020. (lcsd) Modified to add event title on 3/5/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case directly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan as related. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Barr and Shea re #4 Notice of Appearance, #6 Order, #5 Summons Issued Electronically, #3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #1 Complaint,, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief, Case Assigned/Reassigned filed by ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE. Related document: #4 Notice of Appearance filed by RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, #6 Order, #5 Summons Issued Electronically, #3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, filed by RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE, #1 Complaint,, filed by RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief filed by RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE, Case Assigned/Reassigned. (Attachments: #1 Summons Shea)(Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 2, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dean L. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASANTE, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief by ASANTE, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Dean L. Johnson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6874929) filed by ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE. (Attachments: #1 Summons Azar, #2 Summons HHS, #3 Summons CMS, #4 Summons Verma, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant