This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2019 at 07:32:10 (UTC).

ASANTE et al v. AZAR et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 ASANTE filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02512

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASANTE

2650 Siskiyou Blvd., Ste. 200

Medford, OR 97504

YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

2400 S. Avenue A

Yuma, AZ 85364

ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

2825 E. Barnett Rd.

Medford, OR 97504

THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER

500 Sw Ramsey Ave

Grants Pass, OR 97527

SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC.

2865 Daggett Ave.

Klamath Falls, OR 97601

RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS HOSPITAL

10101 Double R. Blvd.

Reno, NV 89521

ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

280 Maple St.

Ashland, OR 97520

RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

1155 Mill St.

Reno, NV 89502

ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER

ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER

ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Defendants

Secretary ALEX M. AZAR, II

Washington, DC 20201

CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES

Hubert H. Humphrey Building, 200 Independence Ave., Sw

Washington, DC 20201

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Hubert H. Humphrey Building, 200 Independence Ave., Sw

Washington, DC 20201

Administrator SEEMA VERMA

Hubert H. Humphrey Building, 200 Independence Ave., Sw

Washington, DC 20201

ALEX M. AZAR, II

SEEMA VERMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dean L. Johnson

181 Utsalady Road

Camano Island, WA 98282

Thomas J. Weiss

Attorney at WEISS & ZAMAN

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2140

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Derek S. Hammond

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

22 #19

Text of Proposed Order Regarding Production of Administrative Records and Supple

22 #15

Exhibit Exhibit N: CMS December 2018 Directed Payment Approval Letter

22 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B: SPA 09-18B

22 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A: SPA 09-018A

19 #2

Text of Proposed Order

19 #1

Memorandum in Support

#19

2 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 1-I

2 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 1-G

2 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 1-F

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons VERMA

1 #3

Summons CMS

1 #2

Summons HHS

1 #1

Summons AZAR

#1

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 10/29/2019. (tb) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #23 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants' replies are due October 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/11/2019. (lctsc3) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Memorandum in opposition to re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ASANTE, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Dean L. Johnson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: SPA 09-018A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: SPA 09-18B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: SPA 11-006, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D: SPA 11-007, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E: SPA 11-024, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F: SPA 11-025, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G: SPA 14-001, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H: SPA 14-002, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I: SPA 17-004, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J: 17-005, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K: CMS 2015 QAF Approval Letter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L: CMS 2017 QAF Approval Letter, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M: CMS March 2018 Directed Payment Approval Letter, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N: CMS December 2018 Directed Payment Approval Letter, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O: MPA Response to Safety Net Issue, #17 Exhibit Cornforth Declaration, #18 Exhibit Matsumoto Declaration, #19 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Production of Administrative Records and Supplemental Briefs)(Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY re #3 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by ASANTE, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ASANTE, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristin Fan)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 9/24/2019. Reply due by 10/8/2019. (tb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Defendants' Consent Motion #9 for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #9 is granted. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by September 24, 2019. It is further ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a deadline for Plaintiffs' Reply. If the parties cannot agree, then Plaintiffs' Reply will be due by October 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/3/19. (DJS) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for A Preliminary Injunction by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Weiss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weiss, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dean L. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests OF ALL PLAINTIFFS by ASANTE, ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS HOSPITAL, ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by ASANTE, ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS HOSPITAL, ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ASANTE, ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS HOSPITAL, ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Dean L. Johnson, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1-E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1-F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1-G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 1-H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1-I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 1-J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 1-K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 1-L, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 1-M, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 1-N, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 1-O, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 1-P, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Q, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 1-R, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 1-S, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 1-T, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 1-U, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6331803) filed by RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS HOSPITAL, THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER INC., ROGUE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE, ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Summons AZAR, #2 Summons HHS, #3 Summons CMS, #4 Summons VERMA, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Dean) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ASANTE is a litigant