This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 09:01:47 (UTC).

A.S., a minor under the age of 18 years by her mother and natural guardian, Kabari Salem v. Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 A S , a minor under the age of 18 years by her mother and natural guardian, Kabari Salem filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malachy E Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01673

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.S., a minor under the age of 18 years by her mother and natural guardian, Kabari Salem

Defendant

Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John E. Lavelle

Attorney at Cellino Law LLP

600 Old Country Road, Suite 412

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Heather M. Eichenbaum

Attorney at Spector Gadon & Rosen, P.C.

Seven Penn Center, 1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 8/15/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/1/2021.Supplemental due by 10/15/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 11/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/1/2022. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/3/21. (bs) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference continued until 11/2/2020 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion. All other aspects of the September 17, 2020 order, remain unchanged. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/14/20. (bs) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC. (Eichenbaum, Heather) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.. This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. It is counsels obligation to supply the conference contact information to opposing counsel and the court. This can be placed on the docket under seal or supplied independently to opposing counsel and the court, in order to protect the privacy and security of the teleconference.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/17/20. (bs) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/17/20. (bs) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC for Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC.. (Eichenbaum, Heather) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC.(Eichenbaum, Heather) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit(s) B

#2

(#2) EXHIBITS by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(ao) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Monroe County, case number 3249-cv-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APAMDC-5251537), filed by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 8/15/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/1/2021.Supplemental due by 10/15/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 11/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/1/2022. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/3/21. (bs) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference continued until 11/2/2020 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion. All other aspects of the September 17, 2020 order, remain unchanged. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/14/20. (bs) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC. (Eichenbaum, Heather) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.. This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. It is counsels obligation to supply the conference contact information to opposing counsel and the court. This can be placed on the docket under seal or supplied independently to opposing counsel and the court, in order to protect the privacy and security of the teleconference.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/17/20. (bs) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/17/20. (bs) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC for Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC.. (Eichenbaum, Heather) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC.(Eichenbaum, Heather) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBITS by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(ao) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Monroe County, case number 3249-cv-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APAMDC-5251537), filed by Great Wolf Lodge of the Poconos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less