This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2021 at 08:20:39 (UTC).

Jamshid Aryeh v. New York Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Jamshid Aryeh filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against New York Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamshid Aryeh

Defendants

New York Life Insurance Company

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott E Calvert

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Michael B Horrow

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Edith S Shea

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 03/22/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#8

(#8) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company, (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company.(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to New York Life Insurance Company answer now due 2/10/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company.(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

3 #1

Proof of Service

#3

(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

1 #3

Proof of Service

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV46452 Receipt No: ACACDC-29893623 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Edith S Shea added to party New York Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 03/22/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company, (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company.(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to New York Life Insurance Company answer now due 2/10/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company.(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, New York Life Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jamshid Aryeh. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/04/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV46452 Receipt No: ACACDC-29893623 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Edith S Shea added to party New York Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Calvert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Brian Horrow