This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 09:29:46 (UTC).

Arya D. Malakouti et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Arya D Malakouti filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06443

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABBAS MALAKOUTI

ARYA D MALAKOUTI

Arya D. Malakouti

Defendants

Mercedes-Benz USA

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Y Jacobson

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha Koopersmith

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Ashley Elise Oaks

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-MBUSA's Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C-Purchase Agreement

1 #4

Exhibit D

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#11) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on September 4, 2020. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Abbas Malakouti.. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/21/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 9:30 a.m. ( See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Arya D. Malakouti, Abbas Malakouti. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/9/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Jury Demand #4 served on July 20, 2020. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, identifying ARYA D. MALAKOUTI, ABBAS MALAKOUTI,MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV21738 Receipt No: ACACDC-27275571 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-MBUSA's Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Samantha Koopersmith added to party Mercedes-Benz USA(pty:dft))(Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Koopersmith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman