This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 08:09:45 (UTC).

Arvay v. HCA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Arvay filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against HCA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01437

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KYLE ARVAY

Defendants

HCA INC., C/HCA INC., HCA HEALTH SVC OF FL, INC. all d/b/a REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BAYONET POINT

HCA Inc. doing business as Medical Center Bayonet Point

C/HCA Inc. doing business as Medical Center Bayonet Point

HCA Health Services of Fl, Inc. doing business as Medical Center Bayonet Point

3Rd Party Plaintiff

Plaintiff Attorney Mitchell Feldman Feldman Group

6916 W. Linebaugh Ave, Suite 101

Tampa, FL 33625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell L. Feldman

Attorney at Feldman Legal Group

6916 W. Linebaugh Avenue, Suite 101

Tampa, FL 33625

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Affidavit

10 #2

Affidavit

10 #1

Affidavit

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service Filed by Mitchell Feldman Feldman Group. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS issued as to HCA Health Services of Fl, Inc. and HCA Inc. (BES) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kyle Arvay. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued as to C/HCA Inc. (LNR) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kyle Arvay. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kyle Arvay. Related case(s): No (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SAO) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18360267) filed by Kyle Arvay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service Filed by Mitchell Feldman Feldman Group. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS issued as to HCA Health Services of Fl, Inc. and HCA Inc. (BES) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kyle Arvay. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to C/HCA Inc. (LNR) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kyle Arvay. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kyle Arvay. Related case(s): No (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SAO) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SAO) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-1437-WFJ-CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18360267) filed by Kyle Arvay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAM JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell Lloyd Feldman