This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 07:31:56 (UTC).

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. v. Tarantino et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Arthur J Gallagher Co filed an Other lawsuit against Tarantino. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05505

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.

Defendants

Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.

Don Tarantino

Michael Machette

Bernadette Heater

Spencer Brush

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah Ann Marsey

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 California Street, Suite 2800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alex Nelson Hadduck

Attorney at Holland & Knight

601 Sw Second Avenue, Suite 1800

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorney

Seth M. Gerber

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

26 #2

Proposed Order

26 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#26

(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss ) filed byArthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Hadduck, Alex) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

25 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#25

(#25) (SEE #24 ORDER) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Correction to Document 22, filed erroneously as a Motion filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#24

(#24) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, . Response due 9/16/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

23 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Alliant Insurance Services, Inc., Spencer Brush, Bernadette Heater, Michael Machette, Don Tarantino. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gerber, Seth) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co... (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Alliant Insurance Services, Inc., Spencer Brush, Bernadette Heater, Michael Machette, Don Tarantino. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#21) NOTICE of certificate of service by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. re #9 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/15/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss ) filed byArthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Hadduck, Alex) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) (SEE #24 ORDER) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Correction to Document 22, filed erroneously as a Motion filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, . Response due 9/16/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Alliant Insurance Services, Inc., Spencer Brush, Bernadette Heater, Michael Machette, Don Tarantino. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gerber, Seth) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of certificate of service by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. re #9 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/15/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. Don Tarantino served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. Michael Machette served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. Bernadette Heater served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. Spencer Brush served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co... (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Alliant Insurance Services, Inc., Spencer Brush, Bernadette Heater, Michael Machette, Don Tarantino. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/24/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alliant Insurance Services, Inc., Spencer Brush, Bernadette Heater, Michael Machette, Don Tarantino ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14790584.). Filed byArthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marsey, Sarah) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex N. Hadduck