This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2020 at 10:22:57 (UTC).

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. v. Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Arthur J Gallagher Co filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01248

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.

Defendants

Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.

Stone Point Capital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Parker Will

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Miranda N. Gilbert

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht and Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kenneth J. Nachbar

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Ryan D. Stottmann

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorneys

John Anderson Sensing

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Jesse Leon Noa

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Kathleen Furey McDonough

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Debra L. Fischer

Kenneth I. Schacter

Seth M. Gerber

Tammy L. Mercer

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Elena C. Norman

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew A. Kassof, P.C.

Stefan H. Atkinson, P.C.

Robert M. Vrana

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel R. Cellucci

 

Court Documents

#39

38 #1

Exhibit A-K

#38

#37

36 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#36

34 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#34

#32

4 #4

Certificate of Service

4 #3

Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

4 #2

[Proposed] Order

4 #1

Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-K

#1

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Letter to Court of Chancery from Clerk USDC/DE regarding Remand Order - re #32 Order. (ntl) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) DECLARATION re #37 Answering Brief in Opposition Declaration of John A. Sensing in support of Defendant Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees by Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(McDonough, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff filed by Alliant Insurance Services, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2020. (McDonough, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) DECLARATION re #34 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff of Lazar P. Raynal by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gilbert, Miranda) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) DECLARATION re #34 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff of Ryan D. Stottmann by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gilbert, Miranda) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff - filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Miranda) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Oral Argument Hearing held on October 16, 2020 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter: Brian Gaffigan, email: gaffigan@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021.(bpg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER re #4 MOTION to Remand is GRANTED; motion for attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/20/20. (ntl) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#31) ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated during the October 16, 2020 teleconference hearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to remand (D.I. 4) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's request for fees and costs (see D.I. 4-1 at 17) is GRANTED; and, Defendants' motions to dismiss and transfer (see D.I. 15-16) are DENIED AS MOOT. The parties shall proceed as instructed and submit a proposed order not later than Monday, October 19. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/20/20. (ntl) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ryan D. Stottmann regarding proposed form of order implementing Your Honor's rulings from the October 16, 2020 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand - re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Delaware Court of Chancery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stottmann, Ryan) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Berdon and Lazar P. Raynal filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/6/20. (ntl) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kathleen Furey McDonough on behalf of Defendant Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. regarding Plaintiff Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.'s letter dated 9/29/20 - re #7 Letter. (McDonough, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ryan D. Stottmann regarding Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.'s Motion to Remand - re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Delaware Court of Chancery. (Stottmann, Ryan) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alliant Holdings Intermediate, Inc., Corporate Parent Alliant Holdings Intermediate, LLC, Corporate Parent Alliant Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Alliant Holdings, L.P. for Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. filed by Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.. (McDonough, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Berdon and Lazar P. Raynal - filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certification By Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification By Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service)(Stottmann, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court Delaware Court of Chancery - filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 [Proposed] Order, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Certificate of Service)(Stottmann, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Stottmann on behalf of Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Stottmann, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Ct of Chancery, Case Number 2020-0780-JTL (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3206965)- filed by Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stone Point Capital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Parker Will