This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 07:24:00 (UTC).

Art Ask Agency v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 Art Ask Agency filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01074

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Art Ask Agency

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

chenqinlin520

dengjie112

lijingwei163070

tanglin281632

wangshengbing467945

wucuiganyin

yuanwenhao12

zhangxiaojian5774

GTC001

zhengguan carpet

HuaShao LLC

Taiyuanticiwenkejiyouxiangongsi

YiFeng Co. Ltd

Yisuodianzi

Be Colorful Store

c6c6c6w8

chengqin63092

120 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 67, 131 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 54 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#41

(#41) CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/6/2023. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#40

(#40) CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/6/2023. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 4/4/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Plaintiff's agreed motions for entry of consent judgments #27 , #34 against Schedule A defendants 124 (Bnostalgia Co. Ltd) and 126 (Happy Trading Co. Ltd.) are granted in part. Consent judgments are entered against both defendants and the causes of action as to these two defendants are dismissed with leave to reinstate within 90 days. Thereafter the judgments shall be final. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov /_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A status hearing is set for 6/6/2023 at 10:30 a.m. This hearing may be converted into a default judgment hearing, if plaintiff is ready and provides timely notice of its intent to all defendants. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#34

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 4/4/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Plaintiff's agreed motions for entry of consent judgments #27 , #34 against Schedule A defendants 124 (Bnostalgia Co. Ltd) and 126 (Happy Trading Co. Ltd.) are granted in part. Consent judgments are entered against both defendants and the causes of action as to these two defendants are dismissed with leave to reinstate within 90 days. Thereafter the judgments shall be final. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov /_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A status hearing is set for 6/6/2023 at 10:30 a.m. This hearing may be converted into a default judgment hearing, if plaintiff is ready and provides timely notice of its intent to all defendants. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#27

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 4/4/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Plaintiff's agreed motions for entry of consent judgments #27 , #34 against Schedule A defendants 124 (Bnostalgia Co. Ltd) and 126 (Happy Trading Co. Ltd.) are granted in part. Consent judgments are entered against both defendants and the causes of action as to these two defendants are dismissed with leave to reinstate within 90 days. Thereafter the judgments shall be final. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov /_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A status hearing is set for 6/6/2023 at 10:30 a.m. This hearing may be converted into a default judgment hearing, if plaintiff is ready and provides timely notice of its intent to all defendants. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#23

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 4/4/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Plaintiff's agreed motions for entry of consent judgments #27 , #34 against Schedule A defendants 124 (Bnostalgia Co. Ltd) and 126 (Happy Trading Co. Ltd.) are granted in part. Consent judgments are entered against both defendants and the causes of action as to these two defendants are dismissed with leave to reinstate within 90 days. Thereafter the judgments shall be final. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov /_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A status hearing is set for 6/6/2023 at 10:30 a.m. This hearing may be converted into a default judgment hearing, if plaintiff is ready and provides timely notice of its intent to all defendants. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Art Ask Agency (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 67, 131 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 54 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/6/2023. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/6/2023. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: zjlzp, 307559412, 3DT-ShirtsZZ, aichude38, azxbb, dundundun, GoodRelaxtime, GOUSAN, Hoodie clothing, huayurunze, meimei857, Muzi clothing, nihao, Queen520, The Art House, TIP723, wang1, xuhaijian02, zuanshihua9, zw89744521, atingshangmao, Bnostalgia Co.Ltd, FANGZE, Happy Trading Co., Ltd, Housester, JINCHANG Co.ltd, JuYuShangMao Co.ltd, Senyue Trading co., ltd., ShenzhenshiLuosennaduokejiYouxiangongsi, shenzhenshimaizigongyipin Co.Ltd, ShenzhenXiaoguoElectronicCommerceCo.Ltd, Timerunfa, WelLink, ZHEKOUJIU, Zlekejiko and Qinman Department Store, Longhua District, Haikou added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: HGS187, HolandNana, Homiez Store, Icarus Land, KINA STORE, KPOLKJNM, laicekejifa, LAVITSHOP, lixinpingszy, loidoan, maotianxinghgddf, MevaBe, Muling, myus store, NamNP, nan he qu ren xu hui bai huo zhong xin, nan he qu wang yu juan bai huo dian, NTL US, NTTHTRANG, Pinkt Pigs, Qiluson, Quoc Huy Shop, Rjzzl, SAGEKING STORE, songqingna, SonHa0812_Shop, Suake, SuperBlankitty, swwwih, teephei, thiha99, Thuanty0308, TPSFashion, TRXN STORE, VOZSTORE, xiaoqi66, xiaowangtongxue, Xingtai Nopeng Trading Co., Ltd., YAXING-Lshop, yuanali, yuanzhouquhuaxinwanbaihuodian, YX GIRL sotre, ZhangTW S, zhangxiaoli6658 and zhoukoushizhibaishangmaoyouxiangongsi added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: chenqinlin520, dengjie112, lijingwei163070, tanglin281632, wangshengbing467945, wucuiganyin, yuanwenhao12, zhangxiaojian5774, GTC001, zhengguan carpet, HuaShao LLC, Taiyuanticiwenkejiyouxiangongsi, YiFeng Co. Ltd, Yisuodianzi, Be Colorful Store, c6c6c6w8, chengqin63092, chengxiaolong4784, ERYVDC, Good custom, guanzhuipixin, happy dddzzz, Kathleen Whynot, MamiStore, mic5111shop, Multimarket Mis Hermanos, panyingliang886, timk, Unnistore, wangbin23074, wuzihan12007, zhanghongyun2136, zhuhaibin4512, AMAXER, Anton Luwei's shop, aolidianzi, baiyingww, camtien99, ChangYuanShiYuJiaBaiHuoDian, Cong thanh 999, CYOU666, dezhoushi dechengqugegedehanshizhajidian, EDENKARD, Emily Dang, Exquisite Duvet Cover, fansigao, Fast delivery in 7-15 days US, FDWYXGS, GaoPengFeik8, Glitter-Dream, GongVing, Greentree s store, H6Home, Handicraft factory and hefeizhunshenwangluokejiyouxiangongsi added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 4/4/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Plaintiff's agreed motions for entry of consent judgments #27 , #34 against Schedule A defendants 124 (Bnostalgia Co. Ltd) and 126 (Happy Trading Co. Ltd.) are granted in part. Consent judgments are entered against both defendants and the causes of action as to these two defendants are dismissed with leave to reinstate within 90 days. Thereafter the judgments shall be final. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov /_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A status hearing is set for 6/6/2023 at 10:30 a.m. This hearing may be converted into a default judgment hearing, if plaintiff is ready and provides timely notice of its intent to all defendants. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 103 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Art Ask Agency (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 4/7/2023 (jn, ). (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Art Ask Agency; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20369513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less