This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2023 at 08:55:38 (UTC).

Art Ask Agency v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Art Ask Agency filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00483

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Art Ask Agency

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations

A45678113 Store

Diau Charn Official Store

Shop1102303440 Store

Shop5015042 Store

Shop910895006 Store

Shop911134117 Store

YXCL Store

YXQYRXS Official Store

Yichun City Dongsheng Jewelry Co., Ltd.

Yiwu City Kefeng Jewelry Co., Ltd.

AB Diy Diamond Painting Store

AugosNat Official Store

Automobile Refitting Store

Babe Love U Store

Baohui2099 Store

Bedding-set. Store

Best time to meet you

140 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

Michael A. Hierl

William Benjamin Kalbac

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 148 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#34

(#34) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/9/2023. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 3/9/2023. No defendant appeared. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a Preliminary Injunction #28 is granted. Enter order. The law firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the Complaint #7 and the Temporary Restraining Order #22 . Telephonic hearing set for 5/9/2023 at 9:15 a.m. on the Webex platform. Parties will not be asked to start their video. Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (650) 479-3207 the meeting number, access code, or PIN/ID is 1809883385. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the hearing with instructions to join the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#32

(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art Ask Agency as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 157 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#30

(#30) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#29

No Description Available

#28

(#30) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#27

No Description Available

26 #1

Exhibit 1

26 #26

Main Document

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 3/9/2023. No defendant appeared. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a Preliminary Injunction #28 is granted. Enter order. The law firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the Complaint #7 and the Temporary Restraining Order #22 . Telephonic hearing set for 5/9/2023 at 9:15 a.m. on the Webex platform. Parties will not be asked to start their video. Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (650) 479-3207 the meeting number, access code, or PIN/ID is 1809883385. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the hearing with instructions to join the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 148 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: skyrim Official Store, smile8888 Store, SOGAO Store, Solution homely Store, sophie beauty Official Store, SVIP Grocery Store, SW No.2 Factory Store Store, Tattrendy Official Store, To be perpetual happniess Store, To BE Store, tongjia999 Store, TXCT Store, Unique Customization Store, VOQ Jewelry Store, WEIWEI WEIWEI-X Decor Store, Wienen Diamond-Painting Store, X-Meow Decor Store, XFRYJIA AB drill painting Store, xgm5392115 Store, xi shang Store, Xianyue Home Textile Store, XIANYUNHE Official Store, Xiaoxiao Costume Store, YEANYI Store, YIZHOUHE Store, YOUQU Official Store, Zenobia Decor Painting Store, ZHIYAN-03 Store, Beijing XYL Trading Co., Ltd., Nanjing Maoteng International Trading Co., Ltd., Ningde Ninglong Import And Export Trading Co., Ltd., Ningxia Huasitai Technology Co., Ltd., Qianshan County Yilai Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Yiwu Babie Jewelry Co., Ltd., Yiwu Beiya Jewelry Co., Ltd., Yiwu Brillant Trading Co., Ltd., Yiwu Hanli Apparel Co., Ltd., Yiwu Ican Jewelry Co., Ltd, Yiwu Langge Crafts Co., Ltd., Yiwu Lansure Import And Export Co., Ltd., Yiwu Pk Accessory Co., Ltd., Yiwu Pofei Accessories Co., Ltd., Yiwu Qiju Jewelry Co., Ltd., Yiwu Saije Trade Co., Ltd., Yiwu Singoli Jewelry Co.,Ltd, Yiwu Songchang Jewelry Co., Ltd., Yiwu Top Service Imp & Exp Co., Ltd., Yiwu Week Commodity Factory, Yiwu Yaojun Import & Export Co., Ltd. and Yiwu Yiche Jewelry Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Mens Clothing Online Store, Mr Wei Store, MTU SmartProduct Store, Muronda Diamond Painting Official Store, mylb MyHome Store, NAYIDA Senior Store, New concept clothing Store, New seconds 001 Store, NICETEE Store, Outlet Stores Of 3d Printed T-shirt Manufacturers Store, REDJCK Xing Hang Store, REREKAXI Official Store, Romantic Travel Store, Sexy Painting By Numbers Store, Shop 18 Store, Shop1100147021 Store, Shop1100179514 Store, Shop1100188260 Store, Shop1100217365 Store, Shop1100222758 Store, Shop1100287188 Store, Shop1102197046 Store, Shop1102211984 Store, Shop1102302106 Store, Shop1102307524 Store, Shop1102309941 Store, Shop1102336240 Store, Shop1102350642 Store, Shop1102375367 Store, Shop1102459331 Store, Shop1102485156 Store, Shop1102488076 Store, Shop1295352 Store, Shop3520054 Store, Shop4990343 Store, Shop5414028 Store, Shop5558141 Store, Shop5594272 Store, Shop5785529 Store, Shop5870865 Store, Shop911125122 Store, Shop911338061 Store, Shop911425197 Store, Shop911830034 Store, Shop912053017 Store, shuai rao D-I-Y diamonds painting Store and Simpleyibay Official Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: A45678113 Store, Diau Charn Official Store, Shop1102303440 Store, Shop5015042 Store, Shop910895006 Store, Shop911134117 Store, YXCL Store, YXQYRXS Official Store, Yichun City Dongsheng Jewelry Co., Ltd., Yiwu City Kefeng Jewelry Co., Ltd., AB Diy Diamond Painting Store, AugosNat Official Store, Automobile Refitting Store, Babe Love U Store, Baohui2099 Store, Bedding-set. Store, Best time to meet you, Biggest man Store, BJCJWF0526 Store, Boutique Online Clothing Store, CH-HMY Store, China quilt cover design factory Store, Costume 7 Store, Custom Beach Towel Store, Customized Cross-Stitch Store, Daa2356346548756 Store, Datomarry Backpack Bag Store, Deng165 Store, diamond-painting Store, DISNEY-World Store Store, Dpsprue Factory Store, DreamFly Diamond Painting Store, ERMENGdeHOME4 Store, European high quality brand stores, Fantasy meteor Store, FEZRGEA Store, GATYZTORY Painting Store, Global animation casual clothes Store, Good Fortune's Store, GOODBAI1015 Store, HANG 2 Store, HEHUOREN Store, Hi Mr One Store, Hippo-Hobby Store, ilovet Store, Jcai Store, JZ-Heng No.03 Store, Kekole Store, Laiba Factory Store, LangHouse Store, LELE 2025 Store, Leyao Official Store, Lighting Lifing Store, liloye123456 Store, lldjzsimon ART Store, LLONE Store, LOVE-FASHION Store, LovelyGirl Store, LSC LAO Store and Manufacturer specializing in the production and custom printing of T-shirts Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/9/2023. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 3/9/2023. No defendant appeared. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a Preliminary Injunction #28 is granted. Enter order. The law firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the Complaint #7 and the Temporary Restraining Order #22 . Telephonic hearing set for 5/9/2023 at 9:15 a.m. on the Webex platform. Parties will not be asked to start their video. Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (650) 479-3207 the meeting number, access code, or PIN/ID is 1809883385. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the hearing with instructions to join the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art Ask Agency as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Art Ask Agency Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 157 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations (smb, ) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Art Ask Agency (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Art Ask Agency; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20283566. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less