This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2022 at 09:17:08 (UTC).

ARSLAN v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 ARSLAN filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter G. Sheridan, Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Rukhsanah L. Singh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04682

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter G. Sheridan

Referral Judges

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Rukhsanah L. Singh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUSTAFA ARSLAN

Defendants

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

UR M. JADDOU

JOHN E. THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AARON BAYRAM

Attorney at ONAL GALLANT & PARTNERS

619 River Dr, Suite 340

Elmwood Park, NJ 07407

Defendant Attorney

BEN KURUVILLA

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BEN KURUVILLA on behalf of UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, JOHN E. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (KURUVILLA, BEN) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Text Minute Entry filed by the Clerk's office on 7/29/2022 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jem) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Settlement Conference held on 7/29/2022. (jem) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. (jjc, ) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, JOHN E. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketJudge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, JOHN E. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13576665), filed by MUSTAFA ARSLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET MUSTAFA ARSLAN, #2 Summons USCIS SUMMONS MUSTAFA ARSLAN, #3 Summons MAYORKAS SUMMONS MUSTAFA ARSLAN, #4 Summons JADDOU SUMMONS MUSTAFA ARSLAN, #5 Summons THOMPSON SUMMONS MUSTAFA ARSLAN)(BAYRAM, AARON) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant