This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:43:05 (UTC).

Arruda et al v. Curves International Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Arruda filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Curves International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00759

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Healthy Hips, LLC

Gina Haley-Morrell

Cynthia Haley

Paradisco Dream LLC

Elaine Solomon

2 Josie's LLC

RH Fitness Systems LLC

RKP Enterprises LLC

Linda Preston

Susan Minicozzi

Barbara Tait

Bonita Arruda

Whanger Health & Fitness LLC

Gary Paolillo

Best Health and Fitness, Inc

Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC

Amy Reeves

Linda Lohse

Defendants

Curves International Inc.

Curves NA, Inc

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan E. Fortman

Attorney at Law Office of Jonathan E. Fortman, LLC

250 Saint Catherine Street

Florissant, MO 63031

Mason Vance Dunnam

Attorney at Dunnam & Dunnam, LLP

4124 W. Waco Dr.

Waco, TX 76710

Andrea Michelle Mehta

Attorney at Dunnam & Dunnam, LLP

4125 West Waco Drive

Waco, TX 76710

Steve A. Miller

Attorney at Steve A. Miller, P.C.

1625 Larimer St., # 2905

Denver, CO 80202

James R. Dunnam

Attorney at Dunnam, Dunnam, etal

4125 W. Waco Dr., P.O. Box 8418

Waco, TX 76714-8418

Defendant Attorney

Kirstie M. Simmerman

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Affidavit of Kirstie M. Simmerman in Support of Motion

7 #2

Proposed Order

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 2 Josie's LLC, All Things Enterprises LLC, Bonita Arruda, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Bodyfit, Inc, Carolyn Deegan, Femme Fit All LLC, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Cynthia Haley, John Haley, Gina Haley-Morrell, Healthy Hips, LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, KV Fitness, LLC, Linda Lohse, MMLC, LLC, Susan Minicozzi, Maria Montoya, Cami Noble, PWO Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, Paradisco Dream LLC, Linda Preston, RH Fitness Systems LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, Amy Reeves, Elaine Solomon, Barbara Tait, Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Fortman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Curves International Inc., Curves NA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kirstie M. Simmerman in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Paolillo, Cynthia Haley, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, Paradisco Dream LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Bonita Arruda, All Things Enterprises LLC, Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Maria Montoya, Elaine Solomon, Bodyfit, Inc, Barbara Tait, PWO Fitness LLC, Linda Lohse, Amy Reeves, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Healthy Hips, LLC, RH Fitness Systems LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, Linda Preston, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, MMLC, LLC, 2 Josie's LLC, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, Femme Fit All LLC, Susan Minicozzi, John Haley, Carolyn Deegan, Cami Noble, KV Fitness, LLC. Curves NA, Inc served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Fortman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Paolillo, Cynthia Haley, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, Paradisco Dream LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Bonita Arruda, All Things Enterprises LLC, Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Maria Montoya, Elaine Solomon, Bodyfit, Inc, Barbara Tait, PWO Fitness LLC, Linda Lohse, Amy Reeves, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Healthy Hips, LLC, RH Fitness Systems LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, Linda Preston, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, MMLC, LLC, 2 Josie's LLC, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, Femme Fit All LLC, Susan Minicozzi, John Haley, Carolyn Deegan, Cami Noble, KV Fitness, LLC. Curves International Inc. served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Fortman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Curves NA, Inc. (am) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Curves International Inc.. (am) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by 2 Josie's LLC, All Things Enterprises LLC, Bonita Arruda, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Bodyfit, Inc, Carolyn Deegan, Femme Fit All LLC, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Cynthia Haley, John Haley, Gina Haley-Morrell, Healthy Hips, LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, KV Fitness, LLC, Linda Lohse, MMLC, LLC, Susan Minicozzi, Maria Montoya, Cami Noble, PWO Fitness LLC, Gary Paolillo, Paradisco Dream LLC, Linda Preston, RH Fitness Systems LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, Amy Reeves, Elaine Solomon, Barbara Tait, Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC. (Fortman, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13884909). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Gary Paolillo, Cynthia Haley, Jenny Schaff Fitness and Music, LLC, Paradisco Dream LLC, Heather's Fitness Center, LLC, Bonita Arruda, All Things Enterprises LLC, Whanger Health & Fitness LLC, Maria Montoya, Elaine Solomon, Bodyfit, Inc, Barbara Tait, PWO Fitness LLC, Linda Lohse, Amy Reeves, Best Health and Fitness, Inc, Healthy Hips, LLC, RH Fitness Systems LLC, RKP Enterprises LLC, Linda Preston, Yako Kwe Nye Sta Fitness, LLC, MMLC, LLC, 2 Josie's LLC, Fit and Firm Forever, LLC, Gina Haley-Morrell, Femme Fit All LLC, Susan Minicozzi, John Haley, Carolyn Deegan, Cami Noble, KV Fitness, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fortman, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Curves International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Curve Construction LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirstie Morgan Simmerman