This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 11:11:29 (UTC).

Arroyo v. Monsanto Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Arroyo filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-30118

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aida Arroyo

Defendant

Monsanto Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J. King

Attorney at Raipher, P.C.

265 State Street

Springfield, MA 01103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CT-230 in MDL Case 2741 received from the Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 230 in MDL Case 2741 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8339959 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Aida Arroyo. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the California Northern District and assigned civil case number 3:20-cv-06246. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case Electronically transferred to the Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 8/26/20. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CT-230 in MDL Case 2741 received from the Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 230 in MDL Case 2741 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8339959 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Aida Arroyo. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less