This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2021 at 11:52:38 (UTC).

Arrow Electronics, Inc. v. DragonWave-X, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Arrow Electronics, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DragonWave-X, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03532

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arrow Electronics, Inc.

Defendants

ComSovereign Holding Corp

Daniel L. Hodges

DragonWave-X, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Douglas Swanson

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Settlement Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Hodges Guarantee

1 #3

Exhibit 3-First Amendment to Settlement Agt

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Second Amendment to Settlement Agt

1 #5

Summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

4 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

#6

#7

#8

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. Daniel L. Hodges waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Swanson, Paul) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. ComSovereign Holding Corp waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Swanson, Paul) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. DragonWave-X, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Swanson, Paul) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#9) Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/1/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 2/17/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/24/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/3/2021 10:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Swanson, Paul) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against ComSovereign Holding Corp, DragonWave-X, LLC, Daniel L. Hodges (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7609943)Attorney Paul Douglas Swanson added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Hodges Guarantee, #3 Exhibit 3-First Amendment to Settlement Agt, #4 Exhibit 4-Second Amendment to Settlement Agt, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swanson, Paul) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DragonWave-X, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Arrow Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Douglas Swanson