This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 07:32:50 (UTC).

Arrietta v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Arrietta filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and Kenneth J. Gonzales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00055

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judge

Kenneth J. Gonzales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paula Arrietta

Albuquerque, NM 87108

Defendants

State of New Mexico

United States of America

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) MOTION for Joinder by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (jn) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#9

No Description Available

#23

(#23) MOTION To Join by Martha Spalding Mozingo. (jn) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Join Jessica Nicole Thompson. (jjs) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#14

No Description Available

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State of New Mexico, United States of America, filed by Paula Arrietta. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#11

No Description Available

#8

(#8) MOTION to Join by Karen Diann Hughes. (jjs) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Join by Pamela Molnar (yc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Joinder by Karin Tang. (jn) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#12

No Description Available

#25

(#25) MOTION To Join by Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (jn) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#13

(#18) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #13 MOTION for Joinder. Mail sent to Gail F. McLaughlin (yc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paula Arrietta. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#22

(#22) MOTION To Join by Stanley Dawldowlcz. (jn) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#15

No Description Available

#19

(#19) MOTION to Join by Mark Agro. (yc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#10

No Description Available

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION To Join by Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (jn) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION for Joinder by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (jn) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION To Join by Martha Spalding Mozingo. (jn) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION To Join by Stanley Dawldowlcz. (jn) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Joinder by Karin Tang. (jn) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Join by Pamela Molnar (yc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Join by Mark Agro. (yc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #13 MOTION for Joinder. Mail sent to Gail F. McLaughlin (yc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Join by Melissa Jane Bazzy. (jjs) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Join Jessica Nicole Thompson. (jjs) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Join by Karen Diann Hughes. (jjs) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Join By Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (jjs) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Join By Douglas Leigh Hughes. (jjs) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION To Join by Lawrence L. Favero. (jn) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION To Join by Rhonda T. Favero. (jn) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales assigned. (ln) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paula Arrietta. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State of New Mexico, United States of America, filed by Paula Arrietta. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.