This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2021 at 09:17:12 (UTC).

Arouca v. American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Arouca filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02336

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manuel Luis Daun Loren Arouca

Defendant

American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L Rogers, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (G)

Po Box 10084, 2 West Washington Street

Greenville, SC 29601

Kelly Reid

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough - Char

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Lewis Andrew Watson

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

11605 N Community House Road, Suite 150

Charlotte, NC 28277

Ryan Duffy

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig

11605 N Community House, #150

Charlotte, NC 28277

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company.(Watson, Lewis) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Monday, 9/20/21 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/12/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#9

(#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/26/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/22/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/20/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/10/2022, Discovery due by 2/8/2022, Motion in Limine due by 4/11/2022, Motions due by 2/22/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/18/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 5/9/2022, Mediation Due by 3/8/2022. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/12/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Manuel Luis Daun Loren Arouca.(Reid, Kelly) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Compl

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/17/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Watson, Lewis) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit F-Unsigned Notice of Filing

1 #5

Exhibit E-Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel

1 #4

Exhibit D-1.8.18 Claim Note

1 #3

Exhibit C-Coverage Position Letter

1 #2

Exhibit B-State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A-Service of Process

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-24-00283. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9985203), filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Coverage Position Letter, #4 Exhibit D-1.8.18 Claim Note, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #6 Exhibit F-Unsigned Notice of Filing)(alew, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry: phone conference held on 9/20/2021 with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit responses to Local Civil Rule 26.03(A)(1-4) (D.S.C.) interrogatories within 14 days. (kmca) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company.(Watson, Lewis) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Monday, 9/20/21 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/12/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/26/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/22/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/20/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/10/2022, Discovery due by 2/8/2022, Motion in Limine due by 4/11/2022, Motions due by 2/22/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/18/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 5/9/2022, Mediation Due by 3/8/2022. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/12/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Manuel Luis Daun Loren Arouca.(Reid, Kelly) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by August 24, 2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/4/21.(alew, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/17/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Watson, Lewis) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (8/11/21). (alew, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-24-00283. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9985203), filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Coverage Position Letter, #4 Exhibit D-1.8.18 Claim Note, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #6 Exhibit F-Unsigned Notice of Filing)(alew, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ANDREW WATSON