This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2019 at 09:16:20 (UTC).

AROMANDO v. CVS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by AROMANDO against CVS CORPORATION in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01249

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATSY AROMANDO, JR.

Defendants

CVS PHARMACY

CVS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean L. Ruppert

Attorney at RUPPERT MANES NARAHARI

600 Grant St, 49Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Michalski

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Case Designation Sheet, Notice served on CVS Pharmacy on 11/8/2019, filed by PATSY AROMANDO, JR. (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement identifying CVS Health Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY. (Michalski, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

3 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michalski on behalf of CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY. (Michalski, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#6

(#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 1/20/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report (attached as Exhibit 1) due by 1/20/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 1/20/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order to the Defendant. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (av) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by PATSY AROMANDO, JR (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5301632), filed by PATSY AROMANDO, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to CVS PHARMACY (jd) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CVS PHARMACY, CVS CORPORATION Answer due from All Defendants. (Michalski, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CVS PHARMACY, CVS CORPORATION Answer due from All Defendants. (Michalski, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disclosure Statement identifying CVS Health Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY. (Michalski, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michalski on behalf of CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY. (Michalski, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 1/20/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report (attached as Exhibit 1) due by 1/20/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 1/20/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order to the Defendant. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (av) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Case Designation Sheet, Notice served on CVS Pharmacy on 11/8/2019, filed by PATSY AROMANDO, JR. (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to CVS PHARMACY (jd) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by PATSY AROMANDO, JR (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5301632), filed by PATSY AROMANDO, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less