This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 08:06:47 (UTC).

Arnov Sandwich, Inc. et al v. CNA Financial Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Arnov Sandwich, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CNA Financial Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08690

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arnov Sandwich, Inc.

Roy Dulal

Defendants

Transportation Insurance Company

Continental Casualty Company

CNA Financial Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Kerveng Tung

Attorney at Kevin Kerveng Tung, P.C.

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 3D

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: Accordingly, by November 1, 2021, plaintiff shall submit a letter explaining in detail why the case is properly designated for assignment to the White Plains courthouse under Rule 18 or acknowledging that it should be reassigned to the Manhattan courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/26/2021) (mml) Modified on 10/29/2021 (mml). (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 27, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code: 5123533. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED.(Telephone) Initial Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/17/2021) (ama) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#12

(#12) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Kevin K. Tung, Esq. dated 10/29/2021 re: Judge's Order Regarding Rule 18 (Docket No.: 5). Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#11

(#11) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Transportation Insurance Company..(sj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#10

(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Continental Casualty Company..(sj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CNA Financial Corp...(sj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transportation Insurance Company,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Continental Casualty Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CNA Financial Corp, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

4 #2

Summons to Transportation

4 #1

Summons to Continental

4 #4

Main Document

3 #2

Summons to Transportation

3 #1

Summons to Continental

3 #3

Main Document

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 27, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code: 5123533. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED.(Telephone) Initial Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/17/2021) (ama) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (aea) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Kevin K. Tung, Esq. dated 10/29/2021 re: Judge's Order Regarding Rule 18 (Docket No.: 5). Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Transportation Insurance Company..(sj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Continental Casualty Company..(sj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CNA Financial Corp...(sj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transportation Insurance Company,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Continental Casualty Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CNA Financial Corp, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Accordingly, by November 1, 2021, plaintiff shall submit a letter explaining in detail why the case is properly designated for assignment to the White Plains courthouse under Rule 18 or acknowledging that it should be reassigned to the Manhattan courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/26/2021) (mml) Modified on 10/29/2021 (mml). (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CNA, Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Continental, #2 Summons to Transportation).(Tung, Kevin) Modified on 10/26/2021 (pc). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin Kerveng Tung. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:0635; Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 110 (Insurance). (sj) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin Kerveng Tung. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CNA Financial Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (sj) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CNA, Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Continental, #2 Summons to Transportation).(Tung, Kevin) Modified on 10/25/2021 (sj). (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CNA FINANCIAL CORPORATION d/b/a CNA, Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25233680)Document filed by Arnov Sandwich, Inc., Roy Dulal..(Tung, Kevin) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CNA Financial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin K. Tung Esq.