This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2020 at 09:48:02 (UTC).

Arnold v. National Aeronautics and Space Administration

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Arnold filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against National Aeronautics and Space Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01372

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marie Encar Arnold

Bakersfield, CA 93306

Defendant

National Aeronautics and Space Administration

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Grant Permission for Electronic Case Filings by Marie Encar Arnold. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#8

(#8) OBJECTIONS to #7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Marie Encar Arnold. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#7

(#7) FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Plaintiff's Applications for leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be denied #2 , #4 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Referred to Judge NONE; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request to file electronically #5 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/10/2020. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Marie Encar Arnold. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marie Encar Arnold. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

3 #1

IFP Application

#3

(#3) ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file long form ifp application signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/14/2020. (Motion for IFP due by 11/16/2020). (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marie Encar Arnold. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against National Aeronautics and Space Administration by Marie Encar Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Grant Permission for Electronic Case Filings by Marie Encar Arnold. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OBJECTIONS to #7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Marie Encar Arnold. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations #6 Order served on Marie Encar Arnold. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Plaintiff's Applications for leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be denied #2 , #4 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Referred to Judge NONE; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request to file electronically #5 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/10/2020. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Marie Encar Arnold. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marie Encar Arnold. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Marie Encar Arnold. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file long form ifp application signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/14/2020. (Motion for IFP due by 11/16/2020). (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marie Encar Arnold. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against National Aeronautics and Space Administration by Marie Encar Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less