This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:13:37 (UTC).

Arnold v. Aaron's, LLC et al (TV2)

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Arnold filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Aaron's, LLC TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan and Cynthia R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judge

Cynthia R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACY ARNOLD

Nashville, TN 37216

Defendants

AARON'S, LLC

400 Galleria Pkwy Se, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30339

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul K Bramlett

Attorney at Bramlett Law Office

P.O. Box 150734

Nashville, TN 37215

Benjamin J. Sweet

Attorney at Nye, Stirling, Hale & Miller, LLP (PA)

1145 Bower Hill Rd, Suite 104

Pittsburgh, PA 15243

Jonathan D Miller

Attorney at Nye, Stirling, Hale & Miller, LLP (CA)

33 West Mission Street, Suite 201

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Jordan T. Porter

Attorney at Nye, Stirling, Hale & Miller, LLP (CA)

33 West Mission Street, Suite 201

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Robert Preston Bramlett

Attorney at Bramlett Law Office

P.O. Box 150734

Nashville, TN 37215

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tracy Arnold. Aaron's, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2022. (Sweet, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 03/24/2022. (Copy mailed to Attorneys Jordan Porter and Jonathan Miller). (AGG) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

10 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 3/22/2022. (Copy of Order mailed to Attorney Benjamin J. Sweet). (LCK) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

7 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Aaron's, LLC. (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (CNC)Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/2022. (CNC) Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/2022. (CNC)Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/2022. (CNC) Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

1 #3

Other ATTACHMENT TO CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tracy Arnold. Aaron's, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2022. (Sweet, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 03/24/2022. (Copy mailed to Attorneys Jordan Porter and Jonathan Miller). (AGG) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jordan Porter (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Tracy Arnold, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Miller (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Tracy Arnold as to Tracy Arnold (AGG) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90; Receipt #G2013578) by Tracy Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(AGG) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90; Receipt # G2013578) by Tracy Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(AGG) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 3/22/2022. (Copy of Order mailed to Attorney Benjamin J. Sweet). (LCK) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90; Receipt # G2013572) filed by Tracy Arnold (AGG) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90; Receipt # G2013572) by Tracy Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(AGG) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Aaron's, LLC. (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (CNC)Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/2022. (CNC) Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/2022. (CNC)Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/10/2022. (CNC) Mailed to attorneys Sweet, Miller, and Porter (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CNC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AARON'S, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4996116.), filed by TRACY ARNOLD. (Attachments: #1 Summons FOR DEFENDANT, #2 Other CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Other ATTACHMENT TO CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AARON'S is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P. Bramlett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan D Miller