This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:44:56 (UTC).

Arnold et al v. U.S. Well Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Arnold filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U S Well Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Arnold

Maria Echeverria

Defendant

U.S. Well Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Wallace

Attorney at The Wallace Firm, PLLC

P.O. Box 2100

Weirton, WV 26062

Defendant Attorneys

Colby S. Bryson

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

One Gateway Center, Suite 600, 420 Fort Duquesne Blvd.

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Edward A Smallwood

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo, LLP

603 Stanwix Street, 10Th Floor, Two Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2020. Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Motions due by 7/1/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Selection set for 10/26/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/9/2020. (cnd) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smallwood, Edward) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Bryson, Colby) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/24/2020) (njz). Modified on 8/24/2020-converted to pdf (njz). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Affirmative defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Well Services, LLC.(Bryson, Colby) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/18/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2020. Discovery due by 10/19/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/18/20. (njz) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Docket sheet/Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Lewis County Circuit Court, (case number 20-C-55), filed by U.S. Well Services, LLC. Filing Fee $400.00 PAID. Receipt #0424-3096837. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket sheet/Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)[Kleeh](cnd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2020. Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Motions due by 7/1/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Selection set for 10/26/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/9/2020. (cnd) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smallwood, Edward) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Bryson, Colby) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/24/2020) (njz). Modified on 8/24/2020-converted to pdf (njz). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affirmative defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Well Services, LLC.(Bryson, Colby) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/18/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2020. Discovery due by 10/19/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/18/20. (njz) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Lewis County Circuit Court, (case number 20-C-55), filed by U.S. Well Services, LLC. Filing Fee $400.00 PAID. Receipt #0424-3096837. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket sheet/Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)[Kleeh](cnd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S WELL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colby S. Bryson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward A. Smallwood