This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2019 at 08:12:24 (UTC).

Armstrong v. Shaw et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Armstrong filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Shaw. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Armstrong

Meridian, MS 39307

Defendants

Jane Does

Warden Frank Shaw

Sgt Unknown D. Chapman

John Does

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball for all further proceedings to include conducting hearings and submitting to the district judge assigned to this cause proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this cause. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on March 5, 2019.(SP) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Warden Frank Shaw, Sergeant D. Chapman on 3/4/2019. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2019. (LDR) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

7 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

7 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - Warden Frank Sh

#7

(#7) ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendants Warden Frank Shaw and Sergeant D. Chapman. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/4/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - Warden Frank Shaw, Sergeant D. Chapman, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(LDR) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) Letter from Anthony Armstrong (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MGB) (Copy of Application mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Anthony Armstrong. (MGB) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/8/19. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Notice of Assignment

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Unknown D. Chapman, Jane Does, John Does, Frank Shaw, filed by Anthony Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Notice of Assignment, #3 Envelope)(NEF'S and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)(MGB) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball for all further proceedings to include conducting hearings and submitting to the district judge assigned to this cause proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this cause. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on March 5, 2019.(SP) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Warden Frank Shaw, Sergeant D. Chapman on 3/4/2019. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2019. (LDR) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendants Warden Frank Shaw and Sergeant D. Chapman. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/4/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - Warden Frank Shaw, Sergeant D. Chapman, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(LDR) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/4/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (LDR) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Anthony Armstrong (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MGB) (Copy of Application mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Anthony Armstrong. (MGB) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/8/19. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony Armstrong (MGB) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Unknown D. Chapman, Jane Does, John Does, Frank Shaw, filed by Anthony Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Notice of Assignment, #3 Envelope)(NEF'S and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)(MGB) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.