This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:18:46 (UTC).

Armstrong v. Lars et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Armstrong filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Lars. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are F. Keith Ball and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00481

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Max Armstrong

Meridian, MS 39307

Defendants

Unknown Moore

MTC

Sgt. Lars

Unknown Barret

EMCF

Warden Shaw

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER, on or before September 16, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 08/22/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138(NOT DATED) as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Max Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/15/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/15/2019. (CS) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

1 #2

Notice of Assignment

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EMCF, Lars, MTC, Shaw, filed by Max Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff's address listed on docket.)(LAT) Modified on 7/9/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, on or before September 16, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 08/22/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 , #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 08/22/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (CS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Max Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138(NOT DATED) as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Max Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/15/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/15/2019. (CS) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Max Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against EMCF, Lars, MTC, Shaw, filed by Max Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff's address listed on docket.)(LAT) Modified on 7/9/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less