This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:14:05 (UTC).

Armen Rostami et al v. Midland Funding, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Armen Rostami filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Funding, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10319

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arlene Rostami

Armen Rostami

Defendants

Midland Funding, LLC

Does 1-10 inclusive

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Whitney D Ackerman

Attorney at Law Office of Whitney D Ackerman

858 South Bedford Drive Suite 301

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Zhana Aivazi

Attorney at Metis Law Group LLP

2933 Foothill Boulevard Suite B

La Crescenta, CA 91214

Arpa Avanessian

Attorney at Metis Law Group LLP

2933 Foothill Boulevard Suite B

La Crescenta, CA 91214

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas F Landers, Jr

Attorney at Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP

401 B Street Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Matthew T Arvizu

Attorney at Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP

401 B Street Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney All Plaintiffs, (Ackerman, Whitney) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 12-5-19 by mail. (Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, identifying Encore Capital Group, Inc. is the parent company of Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Answer

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV39101 Receipt No: 0973-24900660 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer) (Attorney Thomas F Landers, Jr added to party Midland Credit Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas F Landers, Jr added to party Midland Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney All Plaintiffs, (Ackerman, Whitney) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/04/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Armen Rostami, Arlene Rostami. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/31/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 12-5-19 by mail. (Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, identifying Encore Capital Group, Inc. is the parent company of Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV39101 Receipt No: 0973-24900660 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer) (Attorney Thomas F Landers, Jr added to party Midland Credit Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas F Landers, Jr added to party Midland Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Landers, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.