This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 09:03:38 (UTC).

Arlo Technologies, Inc. v. Skybell Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Arlo Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Skybell Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel, Daniel E. Butcher and Roger T. Benitez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00218

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

Presiding Judges

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Roger T. Benitez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arlo Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

SB IP Holdings, LLC

Skybell Technologies, Inc.

Eyetalk365, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean C Cunningham

Attorney at DLA Piper US

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/23/2021. (mme) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, Sean) (mme). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1659 Pending Parallel ITC Action by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, Sean) (mme). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Skybell Technologies, Inc. served. (Cunningham, Sean)(mme). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. SB IP Holdings, LLC served. (Cunningham, Sean) (mme). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. Eyetalk365, LLC served. (Cunningham, Sean) (mme). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv218 BEN (DEB).(no document attached) (jcj) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Cunningham, Sean) (dlg). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *10,097,796*, *10,200,660*, *10,523,906*, *10,097,797*, *9,485,478*, *10,674,120*, *9,432,638* (cc: USPTO)(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15335928.), filed by Arlo Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complain, #6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 7 to Complaint)The new case number is 3:21-cv-218-GPC-DEB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Cunningham, Sean)(zda) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arlo Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Eyetalk365, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean C. Cunningham