This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2020 at 11:42:07 (UTC).

Arlington Christian School v. Selective Way Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Arlington Christian School filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Way Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02949

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arlington Christian School

Defendant

Selective Way Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Remington Huggins

Attorney at McClenny, Moseley & Associates, PLLC

110 Norcross Street

Roswell, GA 30075

Sean Michael Patterson

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC-TX

516 Heights Blvd

Houston, TX 77007

John Zachary Moseley

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC-TX

516 Heights Blvd

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Thomas Dietrichs

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Jessica M. Phillips

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Selective Way Insurance Company (Phillips, Jessica) Modified on 9/11/2020 to edit text (jpk). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#18

(#18) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE by Selective Way Insurance Company of Intent to Serve Subpoenas on Non-Parties (Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER on the #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Per the Parties' request, the Court assigns this case to a six (6) month discovery track. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/17/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#15

(#15) Initial Disclosures by Arlington Christian School.(Patterson, Sean) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#14

(#14) Initial Disclosures by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#13

(#13) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#11

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Selective Way Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 12/14/2020.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate

1 #2

Exhibit -2 -State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Affidavit in Support

#1

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Selective Way Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 12/14/2020.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Selective Way Insurance Company (Phillips, Jessica) Modified on 9/11/2020 to edit text (jpk). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Selective Way Insurance Company of Intent to Serve Subpoenas on Non-Parties (Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER on the #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Per the Parties' request, the Court assigns this case to a six (6) month discovery track. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/17/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial Disclosures by Arlington Christian School.(Patterson, Sean) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Initial Disclosures by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Phillips, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Sean Michael Patterson as to Arlington Christian School regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean Michael Patterson. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/6/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Michael Patterson Pro Hac Vice.by Arlington Christian School. (Huggins, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of John Zachary Moseley Pro Hac Vice.by Arlington Christian School. (Huggins, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Michael PAtterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9922594). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address and name. (cdg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of John Zachary Moseley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9922564). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address and name. (cdg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Michael PAtterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9922594).by Arlington Christian School. (Huggins, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of John Zachary Moseley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9922564).by Arlington Christian School. (Huggins, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Selective Way Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 12/14/2020.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9916526) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit -2 -State Court Pleadings, #3 Certificate, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Way Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Michael Patterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Remington Huggins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Zachary Moseley