This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2019 at 08:55:36 (UTC).

Arkansas Labeling Inc v. Proctor et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Arkansas Labeling Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Proctor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00773

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arkansas Labeling Inc

Defendants

Tim Proctor

Label Edge LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Kennedy

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Regions Center, Suite 2000, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3522

James M. Simpson, Jr.

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Regions Center, Suite 2000, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3522

Defendant Attorneys

Meredith Autumn Powell

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Joseph Wayne Price, II

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor Witness and Exhibit List (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #11 defendants' motion to continue the hearing on Arkansas Labeling's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction; directing the hearing begin at 9:30 a.m. on Friday, 1/10/2020 in Little Rock Courtroom 4C; directing the parties file supplemental briefings following the hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 1/17/2020; directing the parties exchange exhibits that they intend to present and written lists of witnesses that they will or may call at the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 12/30/2019; and directing the parties to submit rebuttal exhibits and written lists of rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#17

(#17) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim CLAIMS VII and VIII of Arkansas Labeling, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor. (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CLAIMS VII and VIII of Arkansas Labeling, Inc.'s Complaint by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor.(Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

14 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Simpson, James) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Autumn Powell on behalf of Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Powell, Meredith) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor Witness and Exhibit List (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER setting hearing on #3 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction on Friday, 12/20/2019, beginning at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom 4C; directing parties to file supplemental briefings by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 12/27/2019; directing the parties to exchange exhibits that they intend to present and written lists of witnesses that they will or may call at the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 12/13/2019; directing the parties to present rebuttal exhibits or written lists of such rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 12/17/2019; and directing the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this Order on defendants at the address listed in the affidavits of service. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Order , filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Tim Proctor served on 11/25/2019. (Simpson, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Order , filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Label Edge LLC served on 11/25/2019. (Simpson, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#6

(#6) Order denying #1 Arkansas Labeling's motion for leave to file under seal; directing the Clerk to lift the seal in this case as to all filings made by Arkansas Labeling prior to the date of this Order; and ordering Arkansas labeling to provide notice of its request for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction to defendants. A hearing will be set by the Court by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/6/2019. (thd) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.) (thd) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074604.) (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.)(thd). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor Witness and Exhibit List (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #11 defendants' motion to continue the hearing on Arkansas Labeling's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction; directing the hearing begin at 9:30 a.m. on Friday, 1/10/2020 in Little Rock Courtroom 4C; directing the parties file supplemental briefings following the hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 1/17/2020; directing the parties exchange exhibits that they intend to present and written lists of witnesses that they will or may call at the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 12/30/2019; and directing the parties to submit rebuttal exhibits and written lists of rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim CLAIMS VII and VIII of Arkansas Labeling, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor. (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CLAIMS VII and VIII of Arkansas Labeling, Inc.'s Complaint by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor.(Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Simpson, James) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Autumn Powell on behalf of Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Powell, Meredith) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor Witness and Exhibit List (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Price, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER setting hearing on #3 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction on Friday, 12/20/2019, beginning at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom 4C; directing parties to file supplemental briefings by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 12/27/2019; directing the parties to exchange exhibits that they intend to present and written lists of witnesses that they will or may call at the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 12/13/2019; directing the parties to present rebuttal exhibits or written lists of such rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 12/17/2019; and directing the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this Order on defendants at the address listed in the affidavits of service. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Order , filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Tim Proctor served on 11/25/2019. (Simpson, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Order , filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Label Edge LLC served on 11/25/2019. (Simpson, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Kristine G. Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 11/6/2019 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. After arguments from counsel and witness testimony, the Court took the matter under advisement. (Present for plaintiff: James Simpson and Kyle Kennedy) (Court Reporter Elaine Hinson) (tmw) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order denying #1 Arkansas Labeling's motion for leave to file under seal; directing the Clerk to lift the seal in this case as to all filings made by Arkansas Labeling prior to the date of this Order; and ordering Arkansas labeling to provide notice of its request for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction to defendants. A hearing will be set by the Court by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/6/2019. (thd) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER scheduling an ex parte hearing on the motions on 11/6/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4C in Little Rock. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/04/2019. (ajt) (Document unsealed on 11/6/2019 based on #6 Order and pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF in Support of #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.) (thd). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.) (thd) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074604.) (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.)(thd). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.) (thd). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.