This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:16:20 (UTC).

Arjo Inc. et al v. Turn Medical, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Arjo Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Turn Medical, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01173

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

ARJO, INC.

HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

Arjo Inc..

Counter Plaintiffs and Defendants

TURN MEDICAL, LLC

Eric Barta

Chris Niederkrom

Tara Psencik

Kevin Wilson

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

Arjo Inc..

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Caroline N. Small

Attorney at Davis & Santos, P.C.

719 S. Flores Street

San Antonio, TX 78204

Alice Kelly

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

200 W Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60606

Tom Rammer

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

200 W Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60606

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Justus Swantner

Attorney at Jackson Walker, L.L.P.

112 E. Pecan Street - Suite 2400

San Antonio, TX 78205

Wasif Qureshi

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney St, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Arjo Inc.., Huntleigh Technology Limited. (Small, Caroline) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Non Consent To Magistrate Judge by Arjo Inc. Huntleigh Technology Limited (Small, Caroline) Modified on 1/18/2022 (rg). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#23

(#23) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Non-Consent to a Magistrate Judge by Eric Barta, Chris Niederkrom, Tara Psencik, Turn Medical, LLC, Kevin Wilson (Swantner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

21 #1

Exhibit A

#21

(#21) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Arjo Inc.., Huntleigh Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Small, Caroline) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Eric Barta, Chris Niederkrom, Tara Psencik, Turn Medical, LLC, Kevin Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swantner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Arjo Inc.., Huntleigh Technology Limited. (Small, Caroline) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9 (to be filed under seal)

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4 (to be filed under seal)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (to be filed under seal)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15472311), filed by ARJO, INC., HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (to be filed under seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (to be filed under seal), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 (to be filed under seal), #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Small, Caroline) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/29/2021) (rg). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/29/2021) (rg). (Attachment 9 replaced on 11/29/2021) (rg). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Arjo Inc.., Huntleigh Technology Limited. (Small, Caroline) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Non Consent To Magistrate Judge by Arjo Inc. Huntleigh Technology Limited (Small, Caroline) Modified on 1/18/2022 (rg). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #21 Joint Motion for Protective Order entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Non-Consent to a Magistrate Judge by Eric Barta, Chris Niederkrom, Tara Psencik, Turn Medical, LLC, Kevin Wilson (Swantner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, Defendants deadline to file theirresponse to Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss filed at Dkt. 19 is extended up to and including January 26, 2022 entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Arjo Inc.., Huntleigh Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Small, Caroline) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Eric Barta, Chris Niederkrom, Tara Psencik, Turn Medical, LLC, Kevin Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swantner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Arjo Inc.., Huntleigh Technology Limited. (Small, Caroline) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER AND ADVISORY - ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Eric Barta, Chris Niederkrom, Tara Psencik, TURN MEDICAL, LLC, Kevin Wilson. (wg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (wg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ARJO, INC., HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED identifying Corporate Parent Arjo AB for ARJO, INC.. (Small, Caroline) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caroline N. Small for Alice Kelly ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15472837) by on behalf of ARJO, INC., HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Small, Caroline) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caroline N. Small for Tom Rammer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15472795) by on behalf of ARJO, INC., HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Small, Caroline) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Proposed Order) (Small, Caroline) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARJO, INC., HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. for all Defendants (Small, Caroline) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15472311), filed by ARJO, INC., HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (to be filed under seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (to be filed under seal), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 (to be filed under seal), #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Small, Caroline) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/29/2021) (rg). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/29/2021) (rg). (Attachment 9 replaced on 11/29/2021) (rg). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arjo-Century Distributing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Justus Swantner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wasif Qureshi