This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2022 at 08:40:00 (UTC).

Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated et al v. Pima, County of

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Pima, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott H Rash. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00512

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott H Rash

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated

Dawn Barkman

Joseph Murphy

Defendant

Pima, County of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexis B Sharpe

Attorney at Jacobson Law Firm

570 N Columbus Blvd., Ste. B

Tucson, AZ 85711

Jeffrey Howard Jacobson

Attorney at Jacobson Law Firm

570 N Columbus Blvd., Ste. B

Tucson, AZ 85711

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Shawn Oller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

Sarah Nicole O'Keefe

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file a reply and response by 2/21/22. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 1/21/22. (BAC) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION To Extend Plaintiffs' Time to File Reply and Response by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Pima, County of. (O'Keefe, Sarah) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant must file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Injunctive Relief by 1/14/22. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 12/30/21. (BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

8 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Pima County on 12/10/2021. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#6

(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Exhibits by Plaintiffs Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Pima, County of. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20142794. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00512-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20142794 filed by Dawn Barkman, Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file a reply and response by 2/21/22. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 1/21/22. (BAC) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION To Extend Plaintiffs' Time to File Reply and Response by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(O'Keefe, Sarah) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Pima, County of. (O'Keefe, Sarah) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant must file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Injunctive Relief by 1/14/22. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 12/30/21. (BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT and Respond to Motion for Injunctive Relief by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oller, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Pima County on 12/10/2021. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Exhibits by Plaintiffs Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Pima, County of. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20142794. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00512-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Dawn Barkman, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20142794 filed by Dawn Barkman, Arizona Conference of Police and Sheriffs Incorporated, Joseph Murphy. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Nicole O'Keefe(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Shawn Oller