This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 08:23:14 (UTC).

Arizmendi v. United Airlines O'Hare International Airport

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Arizmendi filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against United Airlines O'Hare International Airport. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01071

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elaine Arizmendi

Woodale, IL 60191

Defendant

United Airlines O'Hare International Airport

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#5

(#5) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Elaine Arizmendi. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Elaine Arizmendi for attorney representation. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Elaine Arizmendi for leave to proceed in forma pauperis an affidavit. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Elaine Arizmendi. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Elaine Arizmendi. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Elaine Arizmendi for attorney representation. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Elaine Arizmendi for leave to proceed in forma pauperis an affidavit. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Elaine Arizmendi. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less