This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2021 at 10:00:56 (UTC).

Aristors Licensing, LLC. v. Genasys, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Aristors Licensing, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Genasys, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01566

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Aristors Licensing, LLC.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Genasys, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Neil J. McNabnay

Ricardo J. Bonilla

Noel F. Chakkalakal

Thatcher A. Rahmeier

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Francis DiGiovanni

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Stipulation of Dismissal

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(mdb) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SO ORDERED re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/12/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aristors Licensing, LLC. (deBruin, David) Modified on 1/12/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla, Noel F. Chakkalakal for Genasys, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla and Noel F. Chakkalakal filed by Genasys, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/11/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla and Noel F. Chakkalakal - filed by Genasys, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Genasys, Inc. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Genasys, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Aristors Licensing, LLC. by Genasys, Inc..(Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Genasys, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/19/2021. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Genasys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Complaint to January 15, 2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Genasys, Inc. answer due 1/15/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to January 15, 2021 - filed by Genasys, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aristors Licensing, LLC.. Genasys, Inc. served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aristors Licensing, LLC.. (apk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,013,734. (apk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Genasys, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3345988.) - filed by Aristors Licensing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aristors Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin