This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 15:27:40 (UTC).

ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. et al

Case Summary

On September 10, 2021, Arigna Technology Limited (“Plaintiff” or “Arigna”), represented by Charles L. Ainsworth of Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C., filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (“Samsung Electronics”); Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (“Samsung America”); and Apple Inc. (“Apple”) (collectively, “Defendants”) seeking monetary damages, supplemental damages, treble damages, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest and such other relief for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

This is an action for alleged patent infringement by the Defendants of the United States Patent which relate to power semiconductor devices using high-frequency RF signals for use in mobile devices, including smartphones, tablets, and computers: United States Patent No. 6,603,343 and United States Patent No. 8,947,164 (together, the “Asserted Patents”).

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Samsung has infringed and continues to infringe at least claim 1 of the ’343 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271, either literally or through the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, selling, or offering for sale in the United States, and/or importing into the United States, without authorization, products that practice at least claim 1 of the ’343 Patent. Samsung is liable for its infringement of the ’343 Patent pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), (b), and (c).”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Samsung knowingly induced and induces these acts of infringement with the specific intent to encourage them. Samsung has taken and takes active steps to encourage and facilitate direct infringement by these third parties, in this District and elsewhere in the United States, through its manufacture and sale of the infringing products, and through its creation and dissemination of promotional and marketing materials, supporting materials, instructions, product manuals, and/or technical information relating to the products with knowledge and specific intent that its efforts will result in the direct infringement of the ’343 Patent by these third parties.”

 

Further, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Apple has infringed and continues to infringe at least claim 1 of the ’343 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271, either literally or through the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, selling, or offering for sale in the United States, and/or importing into the United States, without authorization, products that practice at least claim 1 of the ’343 Patent. Apple is liable for its infringement of the ’343 Patent pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), (b), and (c).”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Asserted Patents.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to pass a judgment declaring that Defendants Samsung and Apple have each infringed United States Patents along with an award of damages, together with treble damages, for willful infringement, prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs as permitted under 35 U.S.C. § 284. The Plaintiff also requested the Court to order Defendants to pay supplemental damages to Arigna, including any ongoing royalties and interest, with an accounting and costs incurred in this action and such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00943

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

Defendant

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. and SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles L. Ainsworth

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Suite 418

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Healy, Andres) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. Issued to case-opening atty as requested atty admission is pending. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Issued to case-opening atty as requested atty admission is pending. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Issued to case-opening atty as requested atty admission is pending. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/13/2021) (lad). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#6

(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15211405), filed by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Healy, Andres) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. Issued to case-opening atty as requested atty admission is pending. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Issued to case-opening atty as requested atty admission is pending. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Issued to case-opening atty as requested atty admission is pending. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/13/2021) (lad). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15211405), filed by ARIGNA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arigna Technology Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Ainsworth