This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2021 at 09:12:14 (UTC).

Arias v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Arias filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09723

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daly Arias

Defendant

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Thomas Nastro

Attorney at Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

William Howard Yost

Attorney at Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL (OR PLAINTIFF FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, January 20, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s) counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED.( Initial Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/19/20) (yv) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Howard Yost on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Yost, William) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) Modified on 11/23/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C. Discovery Response

1 #2

Exhibit B. Answer

1 #1

Exhibit A. Summons, Complaint, Affidavit of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 28098/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22646586).Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Summons, Complaint, Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B. Answer, #3 Exhibit C. Discovery Response).(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Justin Thomas Nastro to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (yv) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL (OR PLAINTIFF FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, January 20, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s) counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED.( Initial Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/19/20) (yv) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Howard Yost on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Yost, William) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin Thomas Nastro. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $750,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $750,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Thomas Nastro. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc...(Nastro, Justin) Modified on 11/23/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 28098/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22646586).Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Summons, Complaint, Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B. Answer, #3 Exhibit C. Discovery Response).(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less